Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011030579 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011001724 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010113782 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010113780 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010113445 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010113441 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010113440 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010113236 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010073601 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010073600 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010073599 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024123744 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | US202318397634 | 27.12.2023 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | US201816160343 | 15.10.2018 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | US202016796463 | 20.02.2020 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | US201113240322 | 22.09.2011 | US202217570849 | 07.01.2022 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US202016923690 | 08.07.2020 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201615389497 | 23.12.2016 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024123741 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US202217943869 | 13.09.2022 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | US202016924874 | 09.07.2020 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201615276474 | 26.09.2016 | US201414226380 | 26.03.2014 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | US64457209 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201815981465 | 16.05.2018 | US202318398104 | 27.12.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023331011 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | US202117339374 | 04.06.2021 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | US73245710 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US202016866950 | 05.05.2020 | US201916256604 | 24.01.2019 | US202318211412 | 19.06.2023 | US201514641681 | 09.03.2015 | US201615250310 | 29.08.2016 | US201815866000 | 09.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023082472 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US202217943869 | 13.09.2022 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | US202016924874 | 09.07.2020 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201615276474 | 26.09.2016 | US201414226380 | 26.03.2014 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | US64457209 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201815981465 | 16.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023018542 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201213431350 | 27.03.2012 | US73240410 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | US201615226188 | 02.08.2016 | US202217878471 | 01.08.2022 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022250400 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | US202016782368 | 05.02.2020 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226373 | 26.03.2014 | US201715832531 | 05.12.2017 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US202217677455 | 22.02.2022 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016361918 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201213431350 | 27.03.2012 | US73240410 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | US201615226188 | 02.08.2016 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9592692 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2017 | B2 | US2016229210 | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | US201615130109 | 15.04.2016 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | US73225710 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9656488 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | B2 | US2016039230 | 11.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | US73282810 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | US201514920398 | 22.10.2015 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US201314141673 | 27.12.2013 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9533522 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2017 | B2 | US2015298476 | 22.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US201514755141 | 30.06.2015 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226380 | 26.03.2014 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | US64457209 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9381756 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2016 | B2 | US2015183246 | 02.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | US201514643865 | 10.03.2015 | WO2009JP71568 | 25.12.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | US201113240216 | 22.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9498988 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2016 | B2 | US2015174932 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | US73245710 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US201514641681 | 09.03.2015 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014320581 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | US201414226424 | 26.03.2014 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9511611 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2016 | B2 | US2014205353 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201414226428 | 26.03.2014 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9511610 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2016 | B2 | US2014205352 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | US201414226402 | 26.03.2014 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9649861 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2017 | B2 | US2014205350 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226380 | 26.03.2014 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | US64457209 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9855779 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2018 | B2 | US2014205349 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226373 | 26.03.2014 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9539838 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2017 | B2 | US2014205348 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226367 | 26.03.2014 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9566812 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2017 | B2 | US2014205347 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | US201414226325 | 26.03.2014 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014205346 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226289 | 26.03.2014 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9682584 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2017 | B2 | US2014205345 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226262 | 26.03.2014 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9656497 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | B2 | US2014205344 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | US201414226259 | 26.03.2014 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9511609 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2016 | B2 | US2014205343 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226256 | 26.03.2014 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9656496 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | B2 | US2014205342 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226201 | 26.03.2014 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9751349 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2017 | B2 | US2014205341 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226165 | 26.03.2014 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9498998 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2016 | B2 | US2014204170 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226411 | 26.03.2014 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9522556 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2016 | B2 | US2014199108 | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | US201414226417 | 26.03.2014 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9616690 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2017 | B2 | US2014175204 | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | US201314141568 | 27.12.2013 | US201113240322 | 22.09.2011 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9498987 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2016 | B2 | US2014112694 | 24.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | US73282810 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US201314141673 | 27.12.2013 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9498997 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2016 | B2 | US2013315644 | 28.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8651756 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2014 | B2 | US2013142560 | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9403389 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | US2012201588 | 09.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201213431350 | 27.03.2012 | US73240410 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9346296 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2012189366 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US73240410 | 26.03.2010 | US201213431371 | 27.03.2012 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9370949 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2016 | B2 | US2012188325 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201213431277 | 27.03.2012 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | US73274710 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9566808 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2017 | B2 | US2012080550 | 05.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9011028 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2015 | B2 | US2012008999 | 12.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP71568 | 25.12.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8764326 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2014 | B2 | US2010254742 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8740482 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2014 | B2 | US2010247212 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9409425 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2016 | B2 | US2010247208 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010247207 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010247206 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9427988 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2016 | B2 | US2010247205 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8382389 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2013 | B2 | US2010166480 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9493016 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2010166479 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8770877 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2014 | B2 | US2010166478 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010166477 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8562228 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2013 | B2 | US2010166475 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11945217 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2024 | B2 | US2022203727 | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | US201816160343 | 15.10.2018 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | US202016796463 | 20.02.2020 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | US201113240322 | 22.09.2011 | US202217570849 | 07.01.2022 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US202016923690 | 08.07.2020 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201615389497 | 23.12.2016 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11707938 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2023 | B2 | US2021362522 | 25.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | US202117339374 | 04.06.2021 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | US73245710 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US202016866950 | 05.05.2020 | US201916256604 | 24.01.2019 | US201514641681 | 09.03.2015 | US201615250310 | 29.08.2016 | US201815866000 | 09.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11479053 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B2 | US2020406638 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | US202016924874 | 09.07.2020 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201615276474 | 26.09.2016 | US201414226380 | 26.03.2014 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | US64457209 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201815981465 | 16.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11285749 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2022 | B2 | US2020171868 | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | US202016782368 | 05.02.2020 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226373 | 26.03.2014 | US201715832531 | 05.12.2017 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11254149 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2022 | B2 | US2020406648 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | US201816160343 | 15.10.2018 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | US202016796463 | 20.02.2020 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | US201113240322 | 22.09.2011 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US202016923690 | 08.07.2020 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201615389497 | 23.12.2016 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11052685 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2021 | B2 | US2020331282 | 22.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | US73245710 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US202016866950 | 05.05.2020 | US201916256604 | 24.01.2019 | US201514641681 | 09.03.2015 | US201615250310 | 29.08.2016 | US201815866000 | 09.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10744802 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | B2 | US2020180332 | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | US201816160343 | 15.10.2018 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | US202016796463 | 20.02.2020 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | US201113240322 | 22.09.2011 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201615389497 | 23.12.2016 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10744798 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | B2 | US2018257400 | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201615276474 | 26.09.2016 | US201414226380 | 26.03.2014 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | US64457209 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201815981465 | 16.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10675894 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2020 | B2 | US2019193434 | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | US73245710 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201916256604 | 24.01.2019 | US201514641681 | 09.03.2015 | US201615250310 | 29.08.2016 | US201815866000 | 09.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10661589 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2020 | B2 | US2018099517 | 12.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | US201313848750 | 22.03.2013 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201414226373 | 26.03.2014 | US201715832531 | 05.12.2017 | US64455509 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | US201313755174 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10618325 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2020 | B2 | US2019047304 | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | US201816160343 | 15.10.2018 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | US201113240322 | 22.09.2011 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201615389497 | 23.12.2016 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10226949 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2019 | B2 | US2018141349 | 24.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | US73245710 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201514641681 | 09.03.2015 | US201615250310 | 29.08.2016 | US201815866000 | 09.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10201993 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2019 | B2 | US2017100948 | 13.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | US201113240322 | 22.09.2011 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | US201615389497 | 23.12.2016 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10201988 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2019 | B2 | US2016368284 | 22.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | US73245710 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | US201514641681 | 09.03.2015 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | US201615250310 | 29.08.2016 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10189284 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2017008318 | 12.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | US201615276474 | 26.09.2016 | US201414226380 | 26.03.2014 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | US64457209 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150038644 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20120022727 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101774190B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2017 | B1 | KR20160148058 | 23.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07089 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101725746B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2017 | B1 | KR20160093091 | 05.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101719082B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | B1 | KR20150068503 | 19.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101719013B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | B1 | KR20120004417 | 12.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101705382B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2017 | B1 | KR20120024537 | 14.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP02170 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101629049B | Global Dossier | 09.06.2016 | B1 | KR20110106900 | 29.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5733205B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2015 | B2 | JPWO2010113780 | 11.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5445582B | Global Dossier | 19.03.2014 | B2 | JPWO2010113782 | 11.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP55326 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5282815B | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B2 | JPWO2010113365 | 04.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP71568 | 25.12.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6061011B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2017 | B2 | JP2016010980 | 21.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015199845 | 08.10.2015 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5821983B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2015 | B2 | JP2014139013 | 31.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014037100 | 27.02.2014 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5488738B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2014 | B2 | JP2013163382 | 22.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2013065618 | 27.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5234199B | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | B2 | JP2012153143 | 16.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2012054370 | 12.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5359820B | Global Dossier | 04.12.2013 | B2 | JP2011110854 | 09.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5062239B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2012 | B2 | JP2011110849 | 09.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5233971B | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | B2 | JP2011110848 | 09.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5233970B | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | B2 | JP2011110845 | 09.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5229196B | Global Dossier | 03.07.2013 | B2 | JP2011110843 | 09.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5233969B | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | B2 | JP2011110823 | 09.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5233923B | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | B2 | JP2011056755 | 24.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5326877B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2011011410 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5326876B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2011011409 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5326875B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2011011408 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5326874B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2011011407 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5326873B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2011011406 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5267359B | Global Dossier | 21.08.2013 | B2 | JP2011011405 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5326872B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2011011404 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5326871B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2011011403 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5552762B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2014 | B2 | JP2011011402 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5233877B | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | B2 | JP2011011342 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4962524B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2012 | B2 | JP2010234788 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5229067B | Global Dossier | 03.07.2013 | B2 | JP2010234785 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4962523B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2012 | B2 | JP2010234784 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4947085B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2012 | B2 | JP2010234775 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4962521B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2012 | B2 | JP2010234774 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4962520B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2012 | B2 | JP2010234772 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5104804B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2012 | B2 | JP2010234698 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4862915B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2012 | B2 | JP2010234697 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4862914B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2012 | B2 | JP2010234696 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5287433B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2013 | B2 | JP2010234694 | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5233800B | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | B2 | JP2010167755 | 05.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4962522B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2012 | B2 | JP2010167754 | 05.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4862889B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2012 | B2 | JP2010149440 | 08.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4862888B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2012 | B2 | JP2010149439 | 08.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5077223B | Global Dossier | 21.11.2012 | B2 | JP2010149438 | 08.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5077222B | Global Dossier | 21.11.2012 | B2 | JP2010149437 | 08.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5029594B | Global Dossier | 19.09.2012 | B2 | JP2010149435 | 08.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4957717B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2012 | B2 | JP2010149434 | 08.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4424515 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | EP15182690 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | EP21152566 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | EP09804075 | 22.12.2009 | EP13175763 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4344888 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | EP12161271 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | EP20173717 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010JP02165 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | EP10711477 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4309904 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2024 | A3 | EP4309904 | 24.01.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | EP20153442 | 26.03.2010 | EP10711776 | 26.03.2010 | EP12160324 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4303023 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A3 | EP4303023 | 10.01.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | EP10758552 | 26.03.2010 | EP19173286 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4067095 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | EP16178661 | 26.03.2010 | EP10711475 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02154 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3878657 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | EP14161706 | 22.12.2009 | EP09799744 | 22.12.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3871890 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2024 | B1 | EP3871890 | 01.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09798973 | 22.12.2009 | EP14156840 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07089 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3854595 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2024 | B1 | EP3854595 | 28.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | EP15182690 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | EP09804075 | 22.12.2009 | EP13175763 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3730303 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | B1 | EP3730303 | 28.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | EP12161271 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02165 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | EP10711477 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3546232 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2023 | B1 | EP3546232 | 01.01.2020 | A8 | EP3546232 | 02.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | EP10758552 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3106314 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2022 | B1 | EP3106314 | 20.12.2017 | A3 | EP3106314 | 21.12.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | EP10711475 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02154 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2965916 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2021 | B1 | EP2965916 | 24.05.2017 | A3 | EP2965916 | 13.01.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | EP09804075 | 22.12.2009 | EP13175763 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2752301 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2020 | B1 | EP2752301 | 26.08.2015 | A3 | EP2752301 | 09.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | EP09799744 | 22.12.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2752300 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2021 | B1 | EP2752300 | 26.08.2015 | A3 | EP2752300 | 09.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | EP09799744 | 22.12.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2752299 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2018 | B1 | EP2752299 | 26.08.2015 | A3 | EP2752299 | 09.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | EP09799744 | 22.12.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2752298 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2020 | B1 | EP2752298 | 26.08.2015 | A3 | EP2752298 | 09.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | EP09799744 | 22.12.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2743089 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | B1 | EP2743089 | 15.04.2015 | A3 | EP2743089 | 18.06.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09798973 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07089 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666642 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2015 | B1 | EP2666642 | 26.03.2014 | A3 | EP2666642 | 27.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | EP09804075 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2471668 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2020 | B1 | EP2471668 | 22.01.2014 | A3 | EP2471668 | 04.07.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02165 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | EP10711477 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2468520 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2020 | B1 | EP2468520 | 15.01.2014 | A3 | EP2468520 | 27.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | EP10711776 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2468519 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2019 | B9 | EP2468519 | 28.08.2019 | B1 | EP2468519 | 15.01.2014 | A3 | EP2468519 | 27.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02165 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | EP10711477 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2415612 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2019 | B1 | EP2415612 | 04.12.2013 | A4 | EP2415612 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP71568 | 25.12.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2415610 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2019 | B1 | EP2415610 | 18.06.2014 | A4 | EP2415610 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2414170 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2017 | B1 | EP2414170 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2414169 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B1 | EP2414169 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP02170 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2414168 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2017 | B1 | EP2414168 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02165 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2414167 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2016 | B1 | EP2414167 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | WO2010JP02161 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2414166 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2016 | B1 | EP2414166 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02154 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2414165 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | B1 | EP2414165 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07089 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2370267 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | B1 | EP2370267 | 05.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07086 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2370265 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2013 | B1 | EP2370265 | 05.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2370264 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2014 | B1 | EP2370264 | 05.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2236304 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2012 | B1 | EP2236304 | 06.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2236303 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2012 | B1 | EP2236303 | 06.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2202082 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2012 | B1 | EP2202082 | 30.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2202080 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2012 | B1 | EP2202080 | 30.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108312723B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2020 | B | CN108312723 | 24.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | CN201080013339 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105398240B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2018 | B | CN105398240 | 16.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | CN201080013339 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105398230B | Global Dossier | 13.10.2017 | B | CN105398230 | 16.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | CN201080013339 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105150699B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2017 | B | CN105150699 | 16.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | CN201010150090 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105034622B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2018 | B | CN105034622 | 11.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201010150088 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104691118B | Global Dossier | 13.10.2017 | B | CN104691118 | 10.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | CN201080013339 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104691113B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2016 | B | CN104691113 | 10.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | CN201080013339 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104589815B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B | CN104589815 | 06.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | CN201010150109 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104494319B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B | CN104494319 | 08.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | CN201010150878 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104442042B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B | CN104442042 | 25.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | CN201010150928 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102673196B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | B | CN102673196 | 19.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | CN201010150090 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102361758B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2015 | B | CN102361758 | 22.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101850675B | Global Dossier | 10.12.2014 | B | CN101850675 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101850674B | Global Dossier | 14.01.2015 | B | CN101850674 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101850665B | Global Dossier | 14.01.2015 | B | CN101850665 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156371 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101850663B | Global Dossier | 26.11.2014 | B | CN101850663 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101850662B | Global Dossier | 11.02.2015 | B | CN101850662 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2936621 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2020 | C | CA2936621 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | CA2755882 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2755885 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2016 | C | CA2755885 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP02170 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2755882 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2017 | C | CA2755882 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2748177 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2017 | C | CA2748177 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018203326B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2020 | B2 | AU2018203326 | 31.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018203326 | 11.05.2018 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | AU2010231425 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | AU2015243050 | 15.10.2015 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015243050B | Global Dossier | 15.02.2018 | B2 | AU2015243050 | 05.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | AU2010231425 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | AU2015243050 | 15.10.2015 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010231426B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2015 | B2 | AU2010231426 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP02170 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010231425C | Global Dossier | 12.11.2015 | C1 | AU2010231425B | 13.08.2015 | B2 | AU2010231425 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009332345B | Global Dossier | 14.08.2014 | B2 | AU2009332345 | 11.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3666534 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2024 | B1 | EP3666534 | 17.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | EP10711776 | 26.03.2010 | EP12160324 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE545510T | 15.03.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE545513T | 15.03.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0923680 | 28.01.2020 | B1 | BRPI0923680 | 19.01.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1013706 | 03.09.2019 | B1 | BRPI1013706 | 05.04.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP02170 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1016201 | 21.01.2020 | B1 | BRPI1016201 | 19.04.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101758672B | 12.03.2014 | B | CN101758672 | 30.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101758673B | 22.01.2014 | B | CN101758673 | 30.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101758674B | 08.01.2014 | B | CN101758674 | 30.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101758675B | 01.01.2014 | B | CN101758675 | 30.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101758676B | 29.01.2014 | B | CN101758676 | 30.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101850672B | 18.06.2014 | B | CN101850672 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102361760B | 01.04.2015 | B | CN102361760 | 22.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP71568 | 25.12.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103692781B | 11.01.2017 | B | CN103692781 | 02.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | CN200910262678 | 25.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103692782B | 01.06.2016 | B | CN103692782 | 02.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | CN200910262678 | 25.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103692789B | 12.04.2017 | B | CN103692789 | 02.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | CN200910262678 | 25.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103722906B | 13.10.2017 | B | CN103722906 | 16.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | CN200910262678 | 25.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103753972B | 04.01.2017 | B | CN103753972 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | CN200910262677 | 25.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103753978B | 13.10.2017 | B | CN103753978 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | CN200910262677 | 25.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103753979B | 08.06.2016 | B | CN103753979 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103753980B | 06.07.2016 | B | CN103753980 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103786451B | 05.10.2016 | B | CN103786451 | 14.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | CN200910262678 | 25.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103862894B | 08.06.2016 | B | CN103862894 | 18.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104015506B | 05.10.2016 | B | CN104015506 | 03.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | CN200910262675 | 25.12.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104442030B | 12.04.2017 | B | CN104442030 | 25.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | CN200980158165 | 25.12.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN201824652U | 11.05.2011 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02165 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN201989420U | 28.09.2011 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN201989421U | 28.09.2011 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN201989424U | 28.09.2011 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN201989425U | 28.09.2011 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP02170 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009059954 | 10.02.2022 | B4 | DE102009059954 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009059956 | 21.01.2021 | B4 | DE102009059956 | 15.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010012815 | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112010001461 | 16.02.2023 | B4 | DE112010001461T | 14.06.2012 | T5 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202009018839U | 24.10.2013 | U1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2202080T | 12.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2370264T | 27.10.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2370265T | 11.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2414165T | 05.05.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07089 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2666642T | 25.01.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | EP09804075 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2379753T | 03.05.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2431933T | 28.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2460619T | 14.05.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07089 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2521677T | 13.11.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2554777T | 23.12.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE026714T | 28.07.2016 | T2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY156926 | 15.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY163584 | 29.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ596044 | 28.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ596061 | 29.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ616602 | 24.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | NZ59606110 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ617280 | 29.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | NZ59604410 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12014500125 | 07.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12014500140 | 06.07.2015 | B1 | PH12014500140 | 06.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12015501509 | 12.10.2015 | B1 | PH12015501509 | 12.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12015501641 | 12.10.2015 | B1 | PH12015501641 | 12.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009208321 | 09.09.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156355 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156357 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156350 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP55324 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009156369 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2202080T | 31.07.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | EP09180354 | 22.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2370264T | 30.01.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | EP09799744 | 22.12.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2370265T | 31.12.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | EP09804075 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2414165T | 29.08.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09798973 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07089 | 22.12.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2666642T | 31.03.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07085 | 22.12.2009 | EP09804075 | 22.12.2009 | EP13175763 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2202080E | 08.03.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2370264E | 16.09.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2370265E | 04.10.2013 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2414165E | 17.04.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2666642E | 10.02.2016 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2507074 | 20.02.2014 | C2 | RU2011130886 | 27.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2523234 | 20.07.2014 | C2 | RU2011143791 | 10.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2533666 | 20.11.2014 | C2 | RU2011143817 | 10.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP02170 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201704331P | 28.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG172356 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | WO2009JP07087 | 22.12.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG174467 | 28.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009088241 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009270067 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270056 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270221 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270163 | 27.11.2009 | WO2010JP02170 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009154695 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088238 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088227 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009269693 | 27.11.2009 | JP2009270325 | 27.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG174468 | 28.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | WO2010JP02169 | 26.03.2010 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201104990 | 28.03.2012 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2008331642 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009156403 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088440 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156404 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331641 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331643 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088460 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156399 | 30.06.2009 | JP2008331635 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331634 | 25.12.2008 | JP2009088456 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009156398 | 30.06.2009 | JP2009088468 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009088441 | 31.03.2009 | JP2008331639 | 25.12.2008 | JP2008331638 | 25.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010113444 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010113443 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010113365 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8764325 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2014 | B2 | US2010247210 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8757907 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2014 | B2 | US2010247209 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102616026B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | B | CN102616026 | 01.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102616025B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | B | CN102616025 | 01.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101850673B | Global Dossier | 08.07.2015 | B | CN101850673 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101850664B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2015 | B | CN101850664 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010012892 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202010018092U | 11.02.2014 | U1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY163211 | 15.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009086222 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086201 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086172 | 31.03.2009 | JP2009086184 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Divisional application | EP4309904 | Type | Earlier application | EP2414170 | EP2468520 |