EP3666534 - TAPE CASSETTE FOR TAPE PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Koshiro c/o BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
SAGO, Akira c/o BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 20153442.7 | 26.03.2010 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | JP20090086172 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009086172 | JP20090086184 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009086184 | JP20090086201 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009086201 | JP20090086222 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009086222 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666534 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3666534 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41J15/04, B41J3/407 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B41J15/044 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/0057 (US);
B41J11/008 (KR);
B41J15/02 (KR);
B41J32/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | BANDKASSETTE FÜR BANDDRUCKER | [2020/25] | English: | TAPE CASSETTE FOR TAPE PRINTER | [2020/25] | French: | CASSETTE DE BANDE POUR IMPRIMANTE À BANDE | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 01.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10711776.4 / EP2414170 | EP12160324.5 / EP2468520 | Divisional application(s) | EP23214885.8 / EP4309904 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5771803 (TAKAMI HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 5,13,14* figure 2 *; | [XA]US2008080922 (VANDERMEULEN KRIS [BE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,12,15 * figures 23,24 * [A] 8-11 | by applicant | JPS543659B |