EP3666271 - MISCROSPHERES COMPRISING A PLGA MATRIX FOR MEDICAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Street, Suite 900 New York, NY 10016 / US | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANOVER, Kimberly c/o Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Stree Suite 900 New York, NY New York 10016 / US | 02 /
LI, Peng c/o Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Street Suite 900 New York, NY New York 10016 / US | 03 /
MATES, Sharon c/o Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Street Suite 900 New York, NY New York 10016 / US | 04 /
DAVIS, Robert c/o Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Street Suite 900 New York, NY New York 10016 / US | 05 /
WENNOGLE, Lawrence P. c/o Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Street Suite 900 New York, NY New York 10016 / US | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | McNab, Donald C. Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 20153731.3 | 03.12.2014 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | US201361911416P | 03.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361911416 P | US201461925607P | 09.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461925607 P | US201461975702P | 04.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461975702 P | US201462032326P | 01.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462032326 P | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666271 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/437, A61K31/4985, C07D241/36, A61K31/5383, A61P25/18, A61K9/52, A61K45/06 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/5383 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (RU);
A61K9/0019 (IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/34 (KR);
A61K9/0024 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/1647 (KR);
A61K9/5153 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P25/18 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/20 (EP,IL);
A61P25/22 (EP,IL);
A61P25/24 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4985, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5383, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MIKROKUGELN ENTHALTEND PLGA ALS BINDEMITTEL ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN VERWENDUNG | [2020/25] | English: | MISCROSPHERES COMPRISING A PLGA MATRIX FOR MEDICAL USE | [2020/25] | French: | MICROSPHÉRES COMPRENANTS UNE MATRICE DE PLGA POUR UNE UTILISATION MEDICALE | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 16.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14867061.5 / EP3076967 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO2011133224 (INTRA CELLULAR THERAPIES INC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2014145192 (INTRA CELLULAR THERAPIES INC [US]) | by applicant | US4389330 | GB2145422 | US4530840 | US5538739 | WO0035419 | US6548493 | US6552017 | EP0058481 | US6713471 | EP1539115 | US7071186 | US7183282 | USRE39680E | USRE39679E | US7238690 | US2008069885 | WO2008112280 | US2009202631 | WO2009114181 | WO2009145900 | WO2011133224 | WO2013155505 | WO2013155504 | WO2013155506 | US20070786935 | WO2008US03340 |