EP3858958 - COLD PRESSED OLIVE OIL HAVING FREE FATTY ACID CONTENT OF LESS THAN 0.1% [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beyond Oil Ltd. 2 Reshit Hahityashvut Road Kibbutz Yifat 3658300 / IL | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/31] | For all designated states Or, Pinhas 2 Reshit Hahityashvut Road Kibbutz Yifat 3658300 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Or, Pinhas 2 Reshit Hahityashvut Road Kibbutz Yifat 3658300 / IL | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/31] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 20154197.6 | 28.01.2020 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858958 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C11B1/04, C11B1/06, C11B3/00, C11B3/10 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
C11B1/04 (EP);
C11B1/06 (EP);
C11B3/001 (EP);
C11B3/008 (EP);
C11B3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALTGEPRESSTES OLIVENÖL MIT EINEM GEHALT AN FREIEN FETTSÄUREN VON WENIGER ALS 0,1 % | [2021/31] | English: | COLD PRESSED OLIVE OIL HAVING FREE FATTY ACID CONTENT OF LESS THAN 0.1% | [2021/31] | French: | HUILE D'OLIVE PRESSÉE À FROID AYANT UNE TENEUR EN ACIDES GRAS LIBRES INFÉRIEURE À 0,1 % | [2021/31] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/28] | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017226444 (OR PINHAS [IL]) [X] 1,2,6-8,13 * paragraphs [0028] , [0063] - [0071]; claim - * [I] 3-5,9-12,14,15; | [XI]WO9421765 (PQ CORP [US]) [X] 1-5 * claim -; table 4 * [I] 14; | [XI]US5962056 (MELIN CHRISTIAN [FR]) [X] 1,2 * example .; claim -; table . * [I] 3-5; | [I]CN109135920 (GUANGZHOU HANFANG PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [I] 1-5,14,15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO0149814 (CABOTO SEAFOODS [CA], et al) [I] 1-5,14,15 * page 3, paragraph 2; example -; claim - * | by applicant | - Gut, (19610000), vol. 2, page 304 | - Lupus, (20130000), vol. 22, no. 1, pages 26 - 33 |