EP3682761 - BRUSH HEAD ASSEMBLY AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODDARD, Gregory Russ c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DENGLER, Evan Dak Wah c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 20154526.6 | 24.03.2015 | [2020/30] | Priority number, date | US201461970169P | 25.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461970169 P | US201461970157P | 25.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461970157 P | US201461970011P | 25.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461970011 P | US201461970076P | 25.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461970076 P | US201461974760P | 03.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461974760 P | US201462008762P | 06.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462008762 P | US201462025039P | 16.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462025039 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682761 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A46B3/20, A46B5/00, A46B9/00, A46D3/00 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
A46B3/20 (EP,CN,US);
A46B3/06 (RU,US);
A46B3/00 (CN,US);
A46B3/04 (US);
A46B5/0029 (EP,CN,US);
A46B7/00 (CN);
A46B7/06 (US);
A46B9/00 (EP,CN,US);
A46B9/04 (CN,US);
A46D3/00 (EP,CN,US);
A46D3/005 (US);
A61C17/16 (CN);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BÜRSTENKOPFANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2020/30] | English: | BRUSH HEAD ASSEMBLY AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE | [2020/30] | French: | ENSEMBLE TÊTE DE BROSSE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 22.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15715847.8 / EP3122206 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9812948 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [XAY]WO2004080238 (SCHIFFER FA M & C [DE], et al); | [X]WO2005013762 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALT [DE], et al) |