EP3689691 - BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuki, Takanori c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi, 448-8671 / JP | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 20154572.0 | 30.01.2020 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | JP20190015961 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019015961 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689691 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3689691 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/32, B66F9/075 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
B60T8/328 (EP);
B60T8/4072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | BREMSSYSTEM | [2020/32] | English: | BRAKE SYSTEM | [2020/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FREIN | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 03.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IE | 30.01.2023 | LU | 30.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IE | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
LU | 30.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1600703 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1, line 9 - line 42; figure 1 * * page 1, line 68 - page 2, line 9 * [Y] 1,4,5; | [YDA]JPH01273762 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [YD] 1,4,5 * the whole document *[A] 3; | [X]US6179389 (FREITAG RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [X]DE10159326 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2017101296 (MORITA JUNICHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 5; | [X]CN109052238 (GUANGZHOU GUANGTAO TEACHING EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH01273762 |