EP3859119 - AUTOMATIC SEAL WITH AN OVERLOAD MECHANISM AND / OR A RESET MECHANISM WITH A SPRING WITH A WAVEFORM, TRIANGLE OR SAWTOOTH PROFILE OR SIMILAR PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Athmer OHG Sophienhammer 59757 Arnsberg / DE | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kowski, Julian Auf der Burg 32 59494 Soest / DE | 02 /
Hartung, Sergej An der Wilhelmshöhle 10 57413 Finnentrop-Heggen / DE | 03 /
Ludwig, Maico Wallburgerstraße 2 59494 Soest / DE | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Schäperklaus, Jochen, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 20154981.3 | 31.01.2020 | [2021/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3859119 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/215 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
E06B7/215 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/05] |
Former [2021/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE DICHTUNG MIT EINEM ÜBERLASTMECHANISMUS UND/ODER EINEM RÜCKSTELLMECHANISMUS MIT EINER FEDER MIT EINEM WELLEN-, DREICKS-, SÄGEZAHNPROFIL ODER ÄHNLICHEM PROFIL | [2021/31] | English: | AUTOMATIC SEAL WITH AN OVERLOAD MECHANISM AND / OR A RESET MECHANISM WITH A SPRING WITH A WAVEFORM, TRIANGLE OR SAWTOOTH PROFILE OR SIMILAR PROFILE | [2021/31] | French: | JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ AUTOMATIQUE DOTÉ D'UN MÉCANISME DE SURCHARGE ET/OU D'UN MÉCANISME DE MISE À ZÉRO DOTÉ D'UN RESSORT DOTÉ D'UN PROFILÉ D'ARBRE, TRIANGULAIRE, DE DENT DE SCIE OU D'UN PROFILÉ ANALOGUE | [2021/31] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/05] | 29.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0037131 (ATHMER FA F [DE]) [X] 1,8,10-13 * page 4, lines 1,5-7,9,10, paragraph 1; figures 1-5; claim 1 * [A] 2-7,9; | [X]CA2193953 (ADLER RICHARD S [US]) [X] 1,8,11,13* figure 48 *; | [XI]US6125584 (SANDERS VERNARD W [US]) [X] 1,2,8,10,11,13 * page 4, lines 15-24; figures 7-11 * [I] 9 | by applicant | EP20190166220 |