EP3677659 - LIQUID CRYSTALLINE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirschmann, Harald Wiesengasse 23 64291 DARMSTADT / DE | 02 /
Bauer, Monika Ziegelweg 8 63500 Seligenstadt / DE | 03 /
Windhorst, Martina Ringstrasse 9 64839 MUENSTER / DE | 04 /
Reuter, Marcus Buchenlandweg 1 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
Bremer, Matthias Schepp Allee 51 64295 DARMSTADT / DE | 06 /
Fortte, Rocco Laerchenstrasse 5 65933 FRANKFURT AM MAIN / DE | 07 /
Reiffenrath, Volker Brunnersweg 10 64380 ROSSDORF / DE | 08 /
Engel, Martin Tulpenweg 6 64291 DARMSTADT / DE | 09 /
John, Nico Im Kappespfad 64 64850 SCHAAFHEIM / DE | 10 /
Marten, Christoph Lindenweg 19 64354 REINHEIM / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 20155207.2 | 12.03.2015 | [2020/28] | Priority number, date | DE20141003613 | 17.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014003613 | US201462051483P | 17.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462051483 P | [2020/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677659 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3677659 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/12, C09K19/34, C09K19/04, C07D307/91, C09K19/30 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
C09K19/3405 (EP,GB,KR);
C07D307/91 (EP,GB,KR);
C09K19/08 (KR);
C09K19/3048 (EP);
C09K19/3066 (EP);
C09K19/3098 (EP);
C09K19/34 (KR);
G02F1/13 (KR);
C09K2019/0444 (EP,KR);
C09K2019/122 (EP);
C09K2019/123 (EP);
C09K2019/3004 (EP);
C09K2019/3006 (EP);
C09K2019/301 (EP);
C09K2019/3016 (EP);
C09K2019/3021 (EP);
C09K2019/3027 (EP);
C09K2019/3031 (EP);
C09K2019/3051 (EP);
C09K2019/3054 (EP);
C09K2019/3071 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/28] | C09K19/34, C07D307/91, C09K19/04, C09K19/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLINES MEDIUM | [2020/28] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTALLINE MEDIUM | [2020/28] | French: | MILIEU À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2020/28] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 06.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15710433.2 / EP3119854 | Divisional application(s) | EP22164995.7 / EP4039775 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO02055463 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH], et al); | [AD]US2005258399 (SCHMIDT WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [A]DE102006036184 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2009091884 (VVI BRIGHT INC [US], et al) | by applicant | DE2209127 | DE2338281 | DE2240864 | DE2321632 | DE2450088 | DE2637430 | DE2853728 | EP0240379 | WO02055463 | US6861107 | US2005258399 |