EP3693118 - HYBRID ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEM USING LASER AND ARC WELDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/33] | HYBRID ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS USING LASER AND ARC WELDING | ||
[2022/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, FR | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Shuang Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | 02 /
WAGNER, Dustin Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Erik Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/40] |
Former [2020/33] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20155471.4 | 04.02.2020 | [2020/33] | Priority number, date | US201962801467P | 05.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962801467 P | US202016747344 | 20.01.2020 Original published format: US202016747344 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693118 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3693118 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/073, B23K9/173, B23K9/235, B23K26/046, B23K26/342, B23K26/348, B23K28/02 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
B23K26/342 (EP,US);
B23K26/348 (EP,CN,US);
B23K9/044 (US);
B23K26/03 (US);
B23K26/032 (US);
B23K26/046 (EP,US);
B23K26/0626 (US);
B23K26/0648 (US);
B23K26/073 (US);
B23K26/0734 (US);
B23K26/082 (US);
B23K28/02 (EP,US);
B23K35/22 (US);
B23K9/073 (EP,US);
B23K9/126 (US);
B23K9/133 (US);
B23K9/173 (EP,US);
B23K9/235 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2020/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HYBRIDE GENERATIVE FERTIGUNG-SYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LASER- UND LICHTBOGENSCHWEISSEN | [2022/10] | English: | HYBRID ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEM USING LASER AND ARC WELDING | [2022/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE HYBRIDE UTILISANT LE SOUDAGE PAR LASER ET À L'ARC | [2022/10] |
Former [2020/33] | HYBRIDE GENERATIVE FERTIGUNGS-SYSTEME UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LASER- UND LICHTBOGENSCHWEISSEN | ||
Former [2020/33] | HYBRID ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS USING LASER AND ARC WELDING | ||
Former [2020/33] | SYSTÈMES DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE HYBRIDE UTILISANT LE SOUDAGE PAR LASER ET À L'ARC | Examination procedure | 01.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 01.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IE | 04.02.2023 | LU | 04.02.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | FR | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IE | 04.02.2023 | ||
LU | 04.02.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.02.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.02.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN103056533 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [Y] 11,14* abstract *; | [Y]US2013105450 (WALDHOER ANDREAS [AT], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0041]; figure - *; | [Y]US2014027415 (LIN DECHAO [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0028]; figure - *; | [Y]US2017145586 (XIAO ZHIGANG [US]) [Y] 8,12,19 * paragraphs [0018] - [0019] - [0022]; figure - *; | [Y]CN107262878 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [Y] 2,13,17,20 * abstract * |