EP3703367 - ENTROPY CODING SUPPORTING MODE SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Video Compression, LLC 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states GE Video Compression, LLC 1 Research Circle Niskayuna NY 12309 / US | ||
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states GE Video Compression, LLC 8 Southwoods Boulevard Albany, NY 12211 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
George, Valeri c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Nachrichtentechnik Heinrich-Hertz-Institut, HHI Einsteinufer 37 10365 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Bross, Benjamin c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Nachrichtentechnik Heinrich-Hertz-Institut, HHI Einsteinufer 37 10587 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Kirchhoffer, Heiner c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Nachrichtentechnik Heinrich-Hertz-Institut, HHI Einsteinufer 37 10587 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Marpe, Detlev c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Nachrichtentechnik Heinrich-Hertz-Institut, HHI Einsteinufer 37 10587 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Nguyen, Tung c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Nachrichtentechnik Heinrich-Hertz-Institut, HHI Einsteinufer 37 10587 Berlin / DE | 06 /
Preiss, Matthias Broeder Alarmstraat 101 3523TP Utrecht / NL | 07 /
Siekmann, Mischa c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Nachrichtentechnik Heinrich-Hertz-Institut, HHI Einsteinufer 37 10587 Berlin / DE | 08 /
Stegemann, Jan Simplonstraße 55 10245 Berlin / DE | 09 /
Wiegand, Thomas c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Nachrichtentechnik Heinrich-Hertz-Institut, HHI Einsteinufer 37 10587 Berlin / DE | 10 /
Bartnik, Christian Hauptstraße 5H 10317 Berlin / DE | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Schenk, Markus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 20155692.5 | 18.06.2012 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | US201161497794P | 16.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161497794 P | US201161508506P | 15.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161508506 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3703367 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/13, H04N19/91 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
H04N19/13 (EP,BR,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
H03M7/4075 (IL,RU);
H04N19/70 (EP,BR,CN,IL,KR,US);
H03M7/4018 (IL);
H03M7/42 (BR,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,BR,CN,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/126 (IL,RU);
H04N19/132 (EP,BR,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/174 (EP,BR,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/184 (EP,BR,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/50 (EP,BR,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/51 (IL,RU);
H04N19/513 (EP,BR,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/52 (BR,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,BR,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/91 (EP,BR,CN,IL,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENTROPIECODIERUNG MIT UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON MODUSUMSCHALTUNG | [2020/36] | English: | ENTROPY CODING SUPPORTING MODE SWITCHING | [2020/36] | French: | CODAGE D'ENTROPIE PRENANT EN CHARGE LA COMMUTATION DE MODE | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 01.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12728084.0 / EP2721819 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |