Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3683793
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.07.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.06.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
14.06.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
11.06.2024 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
01.04.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.03.2024 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.12.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.11.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.02.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.10.2022 |
First examination report |
|
18.03.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
19.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.01.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
07.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2020 |
Change - representative |
|