EP3683793 - NOISE FILLING WITHOUT SIDE INFORMATION FOR CELP-LIKE CODERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Guillaume c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Helmrich, Christian c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Nachrichtentechnik Heinrich-Hertz-Institut, HHI Einsteinufer 37 10587 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Jander, Manuel c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Schubert, Benjamin c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
Yokotani, Yoshikazu c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Burger, Markus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 20155722.0 | 28.01.2014 | [2020/30] | Priority number, date | US201361758189P | 29.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361758189 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683793 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/028, G10L19/12 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
G10L19/028 (EP,RU,US);
G10L19/087 (RU,US);
G10L19/002 (US);
G10L19/12 (EP,RU,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | G10L19/028 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GERÄUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG OHNE NEBENINFORMATIONEN FÜR CELP-CODIERER | [2020/30] | English: | NOISE FILLING WITHOUT SIDE INFORMATION FOR CELP-LIKE CODERS | [2020/30] | French: | REMPLISSAGE DE BRUIT SANS INFORMATION SECONDAIRE POUR CODEURS DE TYPE CELP | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 22.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2024 | 04.07.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14701567.1 / EP2951816 | EP16176505.2 / EP3121813 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6691085 (ROTOLA-PUKKILA JANI [FI], et al); | [A]US2011202352 (NEUENDORF MAX [DE], et al); | [A]US2012046955 (RAJENDRAN VIVEK [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2012110476 |