EP3695896 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GASES CONTAINING SULPHUR OXIDES FROM COMBUSTION ENGINES BY MEANS OF A MULTI-STAGE ADSORPTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primarine GmbH Bäckerstrasse 11-13 21244 Buchholz i.d.N. / DE | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jürgens, Ralf Norderstedter Straße 68a 24558 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Jaeschke, Rainer Grüner Weg 77 22851 Norderstedt / DE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 20155740.2 | 05.02.2020 | [2020/34] | Priority number, date | DE201910103741 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: DE102019103741 | [2020/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3695896 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
B01D53/0431 (EP);
F01N3/085 (CN,KR,US);
B01D53/04 (US);
B01D53/0407 (KR);
B01D53/0446 (EP);
B01D53/08 (EP);
B01D53/50 (KR);
B01D53/92 (KR);
B01J20/041 (US);
B01J20/043 (US);
B01J20/20 (US);
B01J20/28004 (US);
B01J20/2803 (US);
F01N1/163 (KR);
F01N13/004 (US);
F01N13/0093 (US);
F01N13/08 (CN);
F01N3/0878 (US);
F01N3/0885 (US);
B01D2251/304 (EP);
B01D2251/402 (EP);
B01D2251/404 (EP);
B01D2251/602 (EP);
B01D2251/604 (EP);
B01D2251/606 (EP);
B01D2253/10 (US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/112 (EP);
B01D2253/1124 (US);
B01D2257/302 (EP,US);
B01D2259/128 (US);
B01D2259/40005 (US);
B01D2259/40084 (US);
B01D2259/402 (US);
B01D2259/4566 (US);
F01N2410/14 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG SCHWEFELOXIDHALTIGER ABGASE AUS BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN MITTELS EINES MEHRSTUFIGEN ADSORPTIONSVERFAHRENS | [2020/34] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GASES CONTAINING SULPHUR OXIDES FROM COMBUSTION ENGINES BY MEANS OF A MULTI-STAGE ADSORPTION PROCESS | [2020/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT CONTENANT DE L'OXYDE DE SOUFRE DES MOTEURS À COMBUSTION INTERNE AU MOYEN D'UN PROCÉDÉ D'ADSORPTION À PLUSIEURS ÉTAPES | [2020/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/31] | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1558074 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE) [X] 1,4,6 * page 1, lines 13-26; figure 1 * * page 3, lines 69-110 * * page 4, lines 30-65 * [I] 2,3,5,7; | [XI]EP0539834 (OTTO OEKO TECH [DE]) [X] 8 * column 1, lines 1-9, 43-51; figure 6a * [I] 9-15; | [A]US2018126321 (JAMESON KEVIN F [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 27]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2009149603 | CN102371101 | WO2007054615 | WO2010026018 | DE102010017563 |