EP3706311 - METHOD FOR DETECTING FAULTY OPERATION OF A GAS BLOWER DRIVEN BY A DIRECT CURRENT MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm-papst Landshut GmbH Hofmark-Aich-Strasse 25 84030 Landshut / DE | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weingart, Markus Hölzlweg 6 84056 Rottenburg / DE | 02 /
Simon, Bernhard Franziskanerplatz 4 93059 Regensburg / DE | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstraße 19 80331 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 20156362.4 | 10.02.2020 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | DE201910105749 | 07.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019105749 | [2020/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706311 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3706311 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02P29/024 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
H02P29/027 (EP,CN);
G01R31/343 (CN,US);
G01R31/56 (US);
F04D27/001 (CN);
G01R19/0092 (US);
C03B9/41 (US);
F04D25/06 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2020/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES FEHLERHAFTEN BETRIEBS EINES ÜBER EINEN GLEICHSTROMMOTOR ANGETRIEBENEN GASGEBLÄSES | [2020/37] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING FAULTY OPERATION OF A GAS BLOWER DRIVEN BY A DIRECT CURRENT MOTOR | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN MAUVAIS FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SOUFFLEUR À GAZ ENTRAINÉ PAR UN MOTEUR À COURANT CONTINU | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 15.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102011090075 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0028] , [0037] * * paragraph [0015] *; | [Y]DE102014215458 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 7-9* paragraph [0005] *; | [Y]DE102016006472 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [Y] 1-6,10 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * |