EP3863193 - ADAPTIVE SELF-OPTIMIZING NETWORK USING CLOSED-LOOP FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2021/32] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, James P. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 20156478.8 | 10.02.2020 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863193 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, H04W24/02, H04W48/18, H04W84/06, H04L12/927, H04L12/24 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H04L43/0876 (EP);
H04B7/18506 (EP);
H04B7/18513 (EP);
H04B7/18519 (EP);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/0896 (EP);
H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L43/20 (EP);
H04L67/00 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04L41/0266 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] |
Former [2021/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES SELBSTOPTIMIERENDES NETZWERK UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GESCHLOSSENEM REGELKREIS | [2021/32] | English: | ADAPTIVE SELF-OPTIMIZING NETWORK USING CLOSED-LOOP FEEDBACK | [2021/32] | French: | RÉSEAU À AUTO-OPTIMISATION ADAPTATIVE UTILISANT LA RÉTROACTION EN BOUCLE FERMÉE | [2021/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 10.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2518941 (OPENET TELECOM LTD [IE]); | [X]EP2518942 (OPENET TELECOM LTD [IE]); | [X]EP3002890 (BOEING CO [US]); | [X]EP3565187 (CUMMINGS MARK [US]) |