EP3674938 - IDENTIFYING COMPUTING PROCESSES ON AUTOMATION SERVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CyberArk Software Ltd. 9 Hapsagot Street Park Ofer 2 P.O. Box 3143 4951040 Petach-Tikva / IL | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COPELAND, Andrew c/o CyberArk Software Ltd. 9 Hapsagot Street Park Ofer 2, P.O. Box 3143 4951040 Petach-Tikva / IL | 02 /
NUNEZ, Edward c/o CyberArk Software Ltd. 9 Hapsagot Street Park Ofer 2, P.O. Box 3143 4951040 Petach-Tikva / IL | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 20156737.7 | 11.02.2020 | [2020/27] | Priority number, date | US202016741067 | 13.01.2020 Original published format: US202016741067 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3674938 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3674938 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3674938 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/44, G06F21/55 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
G06F21/44 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (US);
G06F21/554 (EP);
H04L9/0866 (US);
H04L9/0894 (US);
H04L9/14 (US);
G06F2221/033 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] |
Former [2020/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON RECHENPROZESSEN AUF AUTOMATISIERUNGSSERVERN | [2020/27] | English: | IDENTIFYING COMPUTING PROCESSES ON AUTOMATION SERVERS | [2020/27] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE PROCESSUS INFORMATIQUES SUR DES SERVEURS D'AUTOMATISATION | [2020/27] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 16.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014380058 (AGARWAL VISHAL [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9,15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 2-6,10-14; | [A]CN109002705 (SUZHOU KEDA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0041] * |