Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
18.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.04.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
15.04.2024 | Change - representative | |
20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.02.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
13.10.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
08.10.2021 | First examination report | |
02.10.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
02.10.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
02.10.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.07.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
12.02.2020 | Change - representative |