EP3694195 - REMOTELY CONTROLLING ELECTRONIC FUNCTIONS OF A VEHICLE WITHOUT AN INTEGRATED TOUCHSCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polestar Performance AB Assar Gabrielssons Väg 9 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2024/21] |
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation VAK building Assar Gabrielssons väg 40 531 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRANDBERG, Mats c/o Volvo Car Corporation Assar Gabrielsson Vaeg SE-405 31 Gothenburg / SE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20156774.0 | 11.02.2020 | [2020/33] | Priority number, date | US201916272837 | 11.02.2019 Original published format: US201916272837 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3694195 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, B60K35/00 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/29 (EP);
B60K35/80 (EP,US);
B60K35/81 (EP);
B60K35/85 (EP);
G06F21/44 (EP);
G06F21/6218 (EP);
G06F3/038 (EP);
G06F3/04162 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (EP);
G06F3/04847 (EP);
G06F3/0488 (EP);
G07C5/008 (US);
H04M1/724098 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP);
B60K2360/1438 (EP,US);
B60K2360/182 (EP);
B60K2360/184 (EP);
B60K2360/195 (EP);
B60K2360/197 (EP);
B60K2360/55 (US);
B60K2360/563 (EP);
B60K2360/566 (EP);
B60K2360/569 (EP);
B60K2360/573 (EP);
B60K2360/577 (EP);
B60K2360/583 (EP);
B60K2360/5905 (EP);
B60K2360/5911 (EP);
B60K35/213 (US);
G06F2203/0384 (EP);
G06F2221/2129 (EP);
G06F2221/2149 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2020/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNSTEUERUNG VON ELEKTRONISCHEN FUNKTIONEN EINES FAHRZEUGS OHNE EINEN INTEGRIERTEN BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM | [2020/33] | English: | REMOTELY CONTROLLING ELECTRONIC FUNCTIONS OF A VEHICLE WITHOUT AN INTEGRATED TOUCHSCREEN | [2020/33] | French: | FONCTIONS ÉLECTRONIQUES DE COMMANDE À DISTANCE D'UN VÉHICULE SANS ÉCRAN TACTILE INTÉGRÉ | [2020/33] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 29.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2011047056 (AIRBIQUITY INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0060] *; | [I]US2012221188 (KELLY III JAMES J [US]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0006] - [0022] *; | [I]EP2830292 (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0049] *; | [XI]US2015245198 (FLIEGE INGMAR [DE]) [X] 1-5,9-11,13 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,12,14,15; | [I]US2017084169 (SINAGUINAN JUSTIN E [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0069] * | by applicant | US8989961 |