EP3698616 - DRILL COULTER ASSEMBLY WITH PRESSURE ADJUSTABLE PRESSURE ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PÖTTINGER Landtechnik GmbH Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preimeß, Hans-Jörg c/o PÖTTINGER Landtechnik GmbH Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | 02 /
Stadlbauer, Franz c/o PÖTTINGER Landtechnik GmbH Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 20157112.2 | 13.02.2020 | [2020/35] | Priority number, date | DE201920100914U | 19.02.2019 Original published format: DE 202019100914 U | [2020/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698616 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3698616 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/20, A01C5/06 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A01C7/205 (EP);
A01C5/068 (EP);
A01C7/203 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2020/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SÄSCHARANORDNUNG MIT DRUCKREGELBARER DRUCKROLLE | [2020/35] | English: | DRILL COULTER ASSEMBLY WITH PRESSURE ADJUSTABLE PRESSURE ROLLER | [2020/35] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE SOC POURVU DE ROULEAU DE PRESSION À RÉGULATION DE LA PRESSION | [2020/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 25.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | NL | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0372901 (UNIV MASSEY [NZ]) [X] 1-6,10,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - line 49 * * column 5, line 45 - line 58 * * column 6, line 1 - line 15 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 7,9,11,12; | [XI]CA2549371 (BAKER CHRISTOPHER JOHN [NZ], et al) [X] 1-6,10,15 * abstract * * page 13, line 13 - line 25 * * page 14, line 17 - line 20 * * page 17, line 11 - line 23 * * page 18, line 1 - line 19 * * page 19, line 19 - line 24 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 7,9,11,12; | [A]US2016316609 (TOMELERO ELEANDRO [BR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 63-69 ** figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE20101006169 |