EP3716560 - PROCESSING TRANSMISSION SIGNALS IN RADIO TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/25] |
Former [2020/40] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nentwig, Markus Virgilstrasse 8 81673 München / DE | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Bird & Bird LLP - Hamburg Am Sandtorkai 50 20457 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Bird & Bird LLP Am Sandtorkai 50 20457 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2020/40] | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 20157644.4 | 17.12.2008 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | FI20070005958 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: FI 20075958 | US20080071376 | 20.02.2008 Original published format: US 71376 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3716560 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3716560 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/36, H03F1/02, H03F3/24, H04L5/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
H04L27/361 (EP,US);
H03F1/0227 (EP);
H03F3/24 (EP);
H04L27/366 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2020/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSSIGNALEN IN EINEM FUNKSENDER | [2020/40] | English: | PROCESSING TRANSMISSION SIGNALS IN RADIO TRANSMITTER | [2020/40] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX D'ÉMISSION DANS UN ÉMETTEUR RADIO | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 20.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08863556.0 / EP2232713 | EP18192926.6 / EP3435613 | Divisional application(s) | EP21180774.8 / EP3941011 | EP23177581.8 / EP4254848 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.2021
25.01.2024
WITHDRAWN Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/10] |
Former [2022/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.2021
Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 06.04.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.08.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2008 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | FI | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | NO | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | IE | 17.12.2021 | LU | 17.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1598943 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2006178119 (JARVINEN ESKO [FI]); | Opposition | US2001014593 | US2003078011 | WO03090370 | US2004072547 | US2004198258 | US2006009169 | US2006008029 | US2006079178 | EP1650864 | US2006111057 | US2006178119 | US2006229036 | US2006234655 | US2006250825 | US2007005352 | CN101039297 | US2007229180 | EP3435613 | US2004124911 |