EP3674101 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DECORATIVE PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/27] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PRINTED PAPER LAYER | ||
[2023/25] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilin, BV Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [2024/09] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Flooring Industries Limited, SARL 10b, rue des Mérovingiens (Z.I. Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | ||
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Unilin, BV Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | ||
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Unilin, BVBA Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEMENT, Benjamin Truweelstraat 4 B-8790 Waregem / BE | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Unilin Technologies Patent Department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [2023/45] |
Former [2020/27] | Corradini, Lorenzo Marazzi Group S.r.l. Viale Regina Pacis, 39 41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 20157679.0 | 06.01.2015 | [2020/27] | Priority number, date | EP20140150782 | 10.01.2014 Original published format: EP 14150782 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3674101 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3674101 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B44C5/04, B41M5/00, B41M5/52 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B44C5/04 (EP,RU,US);
B41J2/01 (US);
B44C5/0469 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DEKORPANEELS | [2023/25] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DECORATIVE PANEL | [2023/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU DÉCORATIF | [2023/25] |
Former [2020/27] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEDRUCKTEN PAPIERS | ||
Former [2020/27] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PRINTED PAPER LAYER | ||
Former [2020/27] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PAPIER IMPRIMÉ | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 15.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15701839.1 / EP3092133 | Divisional application(s) | EP23201784.8 / EP4286173 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | MC | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
IT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SK | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003064208 (YAMADA HISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,11,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0041] - [0043] - [0096] - [0124] - [0180] - [0192] - [0230] - [0233] * [I] 10,12,13,15; | [I]US6818685 (CHAPMAN DAVID MONROE [US]) [I] 1-9,11 * column 1, line 12 - column 12, line 56 *; | [A]WO2009077561 (TECHNOCELL DEKOR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP2132041 (HUELSTA WERKE HUELS KG [DE]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2011268897 (KLEMANN BRUCE M [US]) [I] 1,2,4,6-8 * paragraphs [0025] - [0039] - [0068] *; | [E]EP2894044 (AGFA GRAPHICS NV [BE]) [E] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0057] - [0062] - [0084] - [0102] - [0132] - [0138]; claim 8 * | by applicant | DE19725829 | EP1290290 | EP1857511 | EP1872959 | EP2132041 | EP2293946 | WO2011124503 | EP2431190 |