EP3673936 - FLOW SENSOR SYSTEM INCLUDING SPRING CONTACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crisi Medical Systems, Inc. 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEKALB, Shawn, Wayne 9992 Fox Valley Way San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 02 /
RAPTIS, Mark 28846 Stonegate Drive Valley Center, CA 92082 / US | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 20157703.8 | 25.08.2016 | [2020/27] | Priority number, date | US201562211116P | 28.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562211116 P | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3673936 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3673936 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/168, A61M5/172, G01F1/66, G05D7/00 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
A61M5/16804 (EP,CN,US);
G01F1/56 (CN,US);
A61M5/16831 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/172 (EP,CN,US);
G01F1/662 (EP,CN,US);
G01F1/667 (CN,US);
G01F15/066 (EP,CN,US);
G01F15/14 (EP,CN,US);
G01F15/18 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DURCHFLUSSSENSORSYSTEM EINSCHLIESSEND FEDERKONTAKTE | [2023/23] | English: | FLOW SENSOR SYSTEM INCLUDING SPRING CONTACTS | [2020/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTEUR DE DÉBIT COMPRENANT DES CONTACTS DE RESSORT | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/27] | DURCHFLUSSSENSORSYSTEM EINSCHLIESSLICH FEDERKONTAKTEN | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 15.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16759951.3 / EP3341051 | Divisional application(s) | EP23202636.9 / EP4280015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5984894 (POULSEN JENS ULRIK [DK], et al) [I] 1,7* column 2 - column 4; figure 5 *; | [I]WO2011075706 (K & Y CORP [US], et al) [I] 1,3,8 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0051]; figure 8a *; | [I]WO2014016315 (TITAN ENTPR LTD [GB]) [I] 1,2,4-6 * page 10 - page 12; figure 4 * |