Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3708623 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3708623



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 138
08.05.2023 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
02.03.2023 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
08.12.2022 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
05.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.12.2022 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.07.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
25.07.2022 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.07.2022 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.03.2021 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.03.2021 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
15.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.12.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.12.2020 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.12.2020 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
30.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
21.09.2020 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
21.09.2020 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.08.2020 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.08.2020 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 3
18.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.08.2020 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 1
05.08.2020 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.08.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.08.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 4
04.08.2020 European search report Search / examination 2
04.08.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
23.07.2020 Search started Search / examination 1
08.05.2020 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 11
06.05.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.05.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.05.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.05.2020 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.04.2020 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
14.04.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.04.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.04.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.04.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.04.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.02.2020 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
18.02.2020 Claims Search / examination 2
18.02.2020 Description Search / examination 18
18.02.2020 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
18.02.2020 Drawings Search / examination 12
18.02.2020 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
02.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19