Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3708623 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CA3015726 CN201780016568 EP17709998 EP20157827 EP2017055868W EP22168879 EP22180815 US201716084200



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019071576Global Dossier 07.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
WO2017EP55868 13.03.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4083151Global Dossier 02.11.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
EP20157827 13.03.2017
WO2017EP55868 13.03.2017
EP17709998 13.03.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4047063Global Dossier 24.08.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
EP20157827 13.03.2017
WO2017EP55868 13.03.2017
EP17709998 13.03.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3426739Global Dossier 27.05.2020B1
EP3426739 16.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
WO2017EP55868 13.03.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109071997BGlobal Dossier 23.11.2021B
CN109071997 21.12.2018A
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
WO2017EP55868 13.03.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3015726Global Dossier 14.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
WO2017EP55868 13.03.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3708623Global Dossier 16.09.2020A1
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
WO2017EP55868 13.03.2017
EP17709998 13.03.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2813606T 24.03.2021T3
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
WO2017EP55868 13.03.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL3426739T 08.03.2021T3
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
WO2017EP55868 13.03.2017
EP17709998 13.03.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017153611Global Dossier 14.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP16159994 11.03.2016
TypeType Divisional application
 EP4047063
 EP4083151
TypeType Earlier application
 EP3426739