blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3708623

EP3708623 - USE OF ALKYD RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.06.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.07.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.03.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.08.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2023Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.07.2023  [2023/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Klaus Schepers Patentverwaltung
Tiergartenstrasse 8
35619 Braunfels / DE
[2021/01]
Former [2020/38]For all designated states
POM Patentverwaltungs GbR
Tiergartenstrasse 8
35619 Braunfels / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHEPERS, Klaus
Tiergartenstrasse 8
35619 Braunfels / DE
02 / MISCHO, Horst
Trimmelter Weg 9
54295 Trier / DE
03 / BIRKEL, Alexander
Saphirweg 18
64287 Darmstadt / DE
04 / SABANOV, Elena
Rosenhuegel 17
33129 Delbrueck / DE
05 / BREMSER, Wolfgang
Bayernweg 46
33102 Paderborn / DE
 [2020/38]
Representative(s)Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstraße 2
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/38]Teipel, Stephan, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date20157827.513.03.2017
[2020/38]
Priority number, dateEP2016015999411.03.2016         Original published format: EP 16159994
[2020/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3708623
Date:16.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2020
ClassificationIPC:C09D167/08, C09D5/16, C09D9/00, // C02F1/50, A61L2/232, D21H21/36
[2020/38]
CPC:
A61L2/232 (EP,US); C09D5/14 (US); A01N37/10 (US);
C02F1/50 (EP,US); C09D167/08 (EP,US); C09D5/1662 (EP,US);
C09D5/1681 (EP,US); D21H21/36 (EP,US); C02F2303/04 (US);
C02F2303/20 (EP,US); C02F2307/14 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C09D167/08, C08L61/28 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/16]
Former [2020/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON ALKYDHARZEN[2020/38]
English:USE OF ALKYD RESINS[2020/38]
French:UTILISATION DE RÉSINES ALKYDES[2020/38]
Examination procedure15.03.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2021Examination requested  [2021/16]
15.03.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2023Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2023/27]
02.03.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2023/27]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP17709998.3  / EP3426739
Divisional application(s)EP22168879.9  / EP4047063
EP22180815.7  / EP4083151
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.202307   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US3684752  (GOTO MASAHIRO, et al);
 [XI]GB1595738  (SAPOLIN PAINTS);
 [XAI]EP0344565  (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]);
 [XAI]WO2010040902  (TIKKURILA OY [FI], et al)
by applicantUS4039494
 WO2010004903
 WO2010040903
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.