EP3702050 - SORTING OF OBJECTS BY PARALLEL SORTERS WITH SEPARATE CROSSED PASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solystic 152-160 avenue Aristide Briand 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRESSE, Didier 940 Route de Miribel 26350 Saint Laurent D'onay / FR | 02 /
SOUQUIERES, Jérôme 467 rue de la Capitainerie 26500 Bourg les Valence / FR | 03 /
MADAR, François 9 rue Dupont 26500 Bourg les Valence / FR | 04 /
BLACHE, Richard 120 A chemin de Lubac 07610 Lemps / FR | [2022/18] |
Former [2020/36] | 01 /
TRESSE, Didier 940 Route de Miribel 26350 SAINT LAURENT D'ONAY / FR | ||
02 /
SOUQUIERES, Jérôme 467 rue de la Capitainerie 26500 BOURG LES VALENCE / FR | |||
03 /
MADAR, François 9 rue Dupont 26500 BOURG LES VALENCE / FR | |||
04 /
BLACHE, Richard 120 A chemin de Lubac 07610 LEMPS / FR | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub Europole - Le Grenat 3, avenue Doyen Louis Weil 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 20158019.8 | 18.02.2020 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | FR20190002053 | 28.02.2019 Original published format: FR 1902053 | [2020/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702050 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3702050 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B07C3/00, B07C3/02 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
B07C3/00 (EP);
B07C3/003 (US);
B07C3/02 (EP);
B07C5/362 (US);
B07C5/38 (US);
B07C2301/0041 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SORTIERUNG VON OBJEKTEN DURCH SORTIERER, DIE MIT QUERVERBINDUNGEN PARALLEL GESCHALTET SIND | [2020/36] | English: | SORTING OF OBJECTS BY PARALLEL SORTERS WITH SEPARATE CROSSED PASSES | [2020/36] | French: | TRI D'OBJETS PAR DES TRIEURS EN PARALLELE AVEC DES PASSES CROISEES DIVISEES | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 28.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 09.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | [2023/44] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102004035365 (DEUTSCHE POST AG [DE]) [A] 1-4* paragraph [0196] *; | [AD]US7170024 (BURNS GARY P [US], et al) [AD] 1-4 * figure - * | by applicant | US7170024 |