EP3798559 - EQUIPMENT FOR BREAKING AND DRYING PLASTIC FILM WASTE TO RECYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plasmaq - Maquinas e Equipamentos Para a Industria de Plasticos, Lda Zona Industrial da Barosa, Lote 8 Carreira d'Agua P-2400-016 Leiria / PT | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONSECA LAGOA, Fernando Rua do Vale Sepal, nº 105 - 1º Esq. P-2400-365 Leiria / PT | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Lourenço Martinho do Rosário, Ana Margarida Gastão Cunha Ferreira Rua dos Bacalhoeiros, 4 1100-070 Lisboa / PT | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 20158135.2 | 19.02.2020 | [2021/13] | Priority number, date | PT20190115843 | 15.10.2019 Original published format: PT 2019115843 | [2021/13] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798559 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3798559 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F26B1/00, F26B3/06, F26B17/10 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
F26B1/005 (EP);
F26B17/10 (EP);
F26B3/06 (EP);
F26B2200/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSRÜSTUNG ZUM BRECHEN UND TROCKNEN VON KUNSTSTOFFFOLIENABFÄLLEN ZUR WIEDERVERWERTUNG | [2021/13] | English: | EQUIPMENT FOR BREAKING AND DRYING PLASTIC FILM WASTE TO RECYCLE | [2021/13] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE DÉSORROUTAGE ET DE SÉCHAGE DES DÉCHETS DE FILMS PLASTIQUES À RECYCLER | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.05.2022 | [2023/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57185522U (KENSAKU NAKAMURA) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0406421 (MOGILEVSKY T I [SU]) [A] 1-10* figure 3 *; | [A]US2004200910 (GRAHAM WILLIAM [ZA], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 *; | [X]KR101064292B (LEE DONG EON [KR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0026] - [0053]; figure 2 *; | [XI]EP3442763 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0037] , [0064] - [0067]; figures 1-5 * [I] 2-10 |