EP3869277 - CASE FOR A WATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patek Philippe SA Genève rue du Rhône 41 1204 Genève / CH | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBEL, Pierre Route de Sullens 8 1029 Villars-Ste-Croix / CH | 02 /
STERN, Thierry Rue du Rhône 41 1204 Genève / CH | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 20158270.7 | 19.02.2020 | [2021/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3869277 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3869277 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G04B3/00, G04B5/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
G04B3/006 (EP);
G04B5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ETUI FÜR ARMBANDUHR | [2021/34] | English: | CASE FOR A WATCH | [2021/34] | French: | ECRIN POUR MONTRE | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 30.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.05.2022 | AT | 18.05.2022 | CZ | 18.05.2022 | DK | 18.05.2022 | EE | 18.05.2022 | ES | 18.05.2022 | FI | 18.05.2022 | HR | 18.05.2022 | IT | 18.05.2022 | LT | 18.05.2022 | LV | 18.05.2022 | MC | 18.05.2022 | NL | 18.05.2022 | PL | 18.05.2022 | RO | 18.05.2022 | RS | 18.05.2022 | SE | 18.05.2022 | SK | 18.05.2022 | SM | 18.05.2022 | BG | 18.08.2022 | NO | 18.08.2022 | GR | 19.08.2022 | IS | 18.09.2022 | PT | 19.09.2022 | IE | 19.02.2023 | LU | 19.02.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
IE | 19.02.2023 | ||
LU | 19.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
LU | 19.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0392980 (MULLER LUDWIG SA [CH]) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 48 - column 4, line 49 * * figure 1 *; | [AD]WO2012126978 (I M H INNOVATIONS MANFACTURES HORLOGERES SA [CH], et al) [AD] 1-7 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024] ** figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0382980 | WO2012126978 |