EP3694135 - TELECOMMUNICATIONS APPARATUS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKABAYASHI, Hideji c/o Sony Europe Limited, IP Europe Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 02 /
WEBB, Matthew William c/o Sony Europe Limited, IP Europe Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20158485.1 | 20.10.2014 | [2020/33] | Priority number, date | EP20130191214 | 31.10.2013 Original published format: EP 13191214 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3694135 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3694135 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3694135 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W24/10 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2020/33] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATIONS APPARATUS AND METHODS | [2020/33] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS | [2020/33] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 13.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14787151.1 / EP3063894 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | LU | 20.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1656765 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [XA]WO2010144729 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) | by applicant | GB2487780 | GB2487757 | GB2487782 | GB2487906 | GB2487908 | GB2487909 | GB2487907 | GB2488513 | GB2488613 | GB2497743 | GB2497742 | GB20110001853 | GB20110001970 | GB20110001981 | GB20110001966 | GB20110001983 | GB20110001982 | GB20110001980 | GB20110001972 | GB20110021767 | GB20110021766 |