EP3868993 - SLIDING DOOR, ESPECIALLY A COOLING ROOM SLIDING DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 05.03.2025 [2025/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frinova GmbH Süderstrasse 12-14 23689 Pansdorf / DE | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dück, Wilhelm Kastorpstr. 4 23560 Lübeck / DE | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 20158489.3 | 20.02.2020 | [2021/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868993 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3868993 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/643, E05F15/657 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
E05F15/643 (EP);
E05Y2201/214 (EP);
E05Y2201/216 (EP);
E05Y2201/648 (EP);
E05Y2201/668 (EP);
E05Y2201/684 (EP);
E05Y2400/3013 (EP);
E05Y2800/25 (EP);
E05Y2800/28 (EP);
E05Y2900/102 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12]
![]() |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHIEBETÜR, INSBESONDERE EINE KÜHLRAUMSCHIEBETÜR | [2021/34] | English: | SLIDING DOOR, ESPECIALLY A COOLING ROOM SLIDING DOOR | [2021/34] | French: | PORTE COULISSANTE, EN PARTICULIER UNE PORTE COULISSANTE D'ESPACE FRIGORIFIQUE | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 16.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | GB | 20.02.2024 | IE | 20.02.2024 | CH | 29.02.2024 | [2025/10] |
Former [2025/09] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
GB | 20.02.2024 | ||
CH | 29.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/48] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
CH | 29.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/45] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 13.12.2023 | |
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB421433 (FRITZ KIEKERT, et al) [X] 1,6,15 * page 1, line 56 - page 3, line 30; figures 1-18 *; | [XA]DE1459148 (HOERMANN KG) [X] 1-6,10,11 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 7,9,13; | [XA]ES2071568 (IGLESIAS BALLESTER MIGUEL ANGE [ES]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 14; figures 1,2 * [A] 12; | [A]DE102008026480 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,14,15* paragraph [0062]; figure 1 *; | [XI]DE202010000745U (ARCA BETEILIGUNGEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,10,11 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-4 * [I] 14 |