EP3715482 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SEPARATION OF RARE EARTH ELEMENTS FROM SECONDARY SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daware, Santosh Vasant Tata Consultancy Servicse Limited Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54-B Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar, Pune 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
Gupta, Shally Tata Consultancy Services Limited Tata Research Development & Design Centre 54-B, Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
Rai, Beena Tata Consultancy Services Limited Tata Research Development & Design Centre 54-B, Hadapsar Industrial Estate Hadapsar 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 20158998.3 | 24.02.2020 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | IN201921012446 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: IN201921012446 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715482 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/00, C22B1/02, C22B3/38, C22B3/10, C22B3/22, C22B59/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
C22B59/00 (EP,US);
C22B1/005 (EP,US);
C22B1/02 (EP,US);
C22B7/007 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR TRENNUNG VON SELTENERDELEMENTEN AUS SEKUNDÄRQUELLEN | [2020/40] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SEPARATION OF RARE EARTH ELEMENTS FROM SECONDARY SOURCES | [2020/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SÉPARATION D'ÉLÉMENTS DE TERRE RARE DE SOURCES SECONDAIRES | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 30.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009249674 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0014] - [0041] *; | [Y] - AARTI KUMARI ET AL, "Recovery of rare earths from spent NdFeB magnets of wind turbine: Leaching and kinetic aspects", WASTE MANAGEMENT., US, (20180501), vol. 75, doi:10.1016/j.wasman.2018.01.033, ISSN 0956-053X, pages 486 - 498, XP055720107 [Y] 1-13 * page 488 - page 495; figures 3,4,19; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.wasman.2018.01.033 | [Y] - :U. U Bast ET AL, "Abschlussbericht zum Verbundvorhaben Recycling von Komponenten und strategischen Metallen aus elektrischen Fahrantrieben Kennwort: MORE (Motor Recycling)", (20141231), pages 1 - 116, URL: https://www.ifa.tu-clausthal.de/fileadmin/Aufbereitung/Dokumente_News_ETC/MORE_Abschlussbericht.pdf, (20200731), XP055719518 [Y] 1-13 * page 37 - page 39 * * page 48 - page 76; figure 52 * | [A] - HO-SUNG YOON ET AL, "Recovery Process Development for the Rare Earths from Permanent Magnet Scraps Leach Liquors", JOURNAL OF THE BRAZILIAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, São Paulo; BR, (20151231), doi:10.5935/0103-5053.20150077, ISSN 0103-5053, XP055720211 [A] 1-13 * page 1144 - page 1150; figures 2,6,10; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5935/0103-5053.20150077 |