EP3702506 - COMPOUND NEEDLE FOR FLAT KNITTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Cixing Co., Ltd. No. 6 Baisha Road Cixi Zhejiang / CN | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Pingfan Ningbo Cixing Co., Ltd. No.6 Baisha Road Cixi, Zhejiang / CN | 02 /
XU, Weidong Ningbo Cixing Co., Ltd. No.6 Baisha Road Cixi, Zhejiang / CN | 03 /
LI, Lijun Ningbo Cixing Co., Ltd. No.6 Baisha Road Cixi, Zhejiang / CN | 04 /
LVTHI, Christophe Michel Ningbo Cixing Co., Ltd. No.6 Baisha Road Cixi, Zhejiang / CN | 05 /
HU, Yueyong Ningbo Cixing Co., Ltd. No.6 Baisha Road Cixi, Zhejiang / CN | 06 /
ZOU, Licheng Ningbo Cixing Co., Ltd. No.6 Baisha Road Cixi, Zhejiang / CN | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 20159260.7 | 25.02.2020 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | CN201910149954 | 28.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910149954 | [2020/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702506 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D04B35/06 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
D04B35/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEBERNADEL FÜR EINE FLACHSTRICKMASCHINE | [2020/36] | English: | COMPOUND NEEDLE FOR FLAT KNITTING MACHINE | [2020/36] | French: | AIGUILLE À COULISSE POUR UNE MACHINE À TRICOTER RECTILIGNE | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1088820 (HOFFMANN AUGUST) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 1-14; figures 11-15 * * page 2, column 2, paragraph last three paragraphs * * page 3, column 1, paragraphs 1-22 *; | [Y]US2002112509 (BASEGGIO MARCELLO [CH], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0020] , [ 0022] , [0 25] - [0027]; figures 2-11 *; | [Y]EP1368520 (HOFMANN ULRICH [DE]) [Y] 8* paragraphs [0031] , [0040]; figures 5,15-16 *; | [Y]WO2006062205 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0033]; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2007231448 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figure 7 *; | [Y]EP2397589 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0010] , [0017] , [0019]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP2397590 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1a-b,2b *; | [Y]CN203333962U (NINGBO CIXING CO LTD) [Y] 9,10 * paragraph [0017]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]CN108035063 (NINGBO CIXING CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0018]; figures 2,3,4a * | by applicant | CN20181043037 |