EP3716285 - MODELING A NEURONAL CONTROLLER EXHIBITING HUMAN POSTURAL SWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sinha, Aniruddha Tata Consultancy Services Limited Block -1B, Eco Space, Plot No. IIF/12 (Old No. AA-II/BLK 3. I.T) Street 59 M. WIDE (R.O.W.) Road, New Town, Rajarhat, P.S. Rajarhat, D 700160 Kolkata - West Bengal / IN | 02 /
Mazumder, Oishee Tata Consultancy Services Limited Block -1B, Eco Space, Plot No. IIF/12 (Old No. AA-II/BLK 3. I.T) Street 59 M. WIDE (R.O.W.) Road, New Town, Rajarhat, P.S. Rajarhat, D 700160 Kolkata - West Bengal / IN | 03 /
Chatterjee, Debatri Tata Consultancy Services Limited Block -1B, Eco Space, Plot No. IIF/12 (Old No. AA-II/BLK 3. I.T) Street 59 M. WIDE (R.O.W.) Road, New Town, Rajarhat, P.S. Rajarhat, D 700160 Kolkata - West Bengal / IN | 04 /
Vaddadi, Srinivasa Chakravarthy Indian Institute Of Technology, Madras, Department of Biotechnology 1st Cross Rd, Indian Institute Of Technology 600036 Chennai - Tamil Nadu / IN | 05 /
Biswas, Dipayan Indian Institute Of Technology, Madras, Department of Biotechnology 1st Cross Rd, Indian Institute Of Technology 600036 Chennai - Tamil Nadu / IN | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 20159346.4 | 25.02.2020 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | IN201921012442 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: IN201921012442 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3716285 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3716285 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/50, G16H50/70, A61B5/11, A61B5/00 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G16H50/50 (EP);
A61B5/7267 (US);
A61B5/1116 (EP,US);
A61B5/1121 (US);
A61B5/1122 (EP);
A61B5/4023 (US);
A61B5/4082 (EP);
A61B5/72 (EP);
A61B5/7203 (US);
A61B5/7225 (US);
A61B5/7246 (EP);
A61B5/725 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | G16H50/50, A61B5/11, G16H50/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MODELLIERUNG EINES NEURONALEN REGLERS, DER MENSCHLICHE POSTURALE SCHWANKUNG DARLEGT | [2020/40] | English: | MODELING A NEURONAL CONTROLLER EXHIBITING HUMAN POSTURAL SWAY | [2020/40] | French: | MODÉLISATION D'UN CONTRÔLEUR NEURONAL PRÉSENTANT UN BALANCEMENT POSTURAL HUMAIN | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 23.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | IN201921012442 |