EP3702537 - SPECIAL UTILITY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aebi Schmidt Deutschland GmbH Albtalstr. 36 79837 St. Blasien / DE | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Dieter Prinz-Max-Allee 32 79877 Friedenweiler / DE | 02 /
Denz, Lorenz Hartmut Im Steinacker 8 79875 Dachsberg / DE | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 20159497.5 | 26.02.2020 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | DE201910104852 | 26.02.2019 Original published format: DE102019104852 | [2020/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702537 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3702537 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36, E02F3/76, F16L37/56 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
E01H5/06 (EP);
E02F3/3631 (EP);
E02F3/365 (EP);
E02F3/3654 (EP);
E02F3/3663 (EP);
E02F3/7622 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SONDERNUTZFAHRZEUG | [2020/36] | English: | SPECIAL UTILITY VEHICLE | [2020/36] | French: | VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE SPÉCIAL | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 02.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2020 | AL | 08.12.2021 | CY | 08.12.2021 | CZ | 08.12.2021 | DK | 08.12.2021 | EE | 08.12.2021 | ES | 08.12.2021 | FI | 08.12.2021 | HR | 08.12.2021 | IT | 08.12.2021 | LT | 08.12.2021 | LV | 08.12.2021 | MC | 08.12.2021 | MK | 08.12.2021 | MT | 08.12.2021 | NL | 08.12.2021 | PL | 08.12.2021 | RO | 08.12.2021 | RS | 08.12.2021 | SI | 08.12.2021 | SK | 08.12.2021 | SM | 08.12.2021 | IE | 26.02.2022 | LU | 26.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | FR | 28.02.2022 | BG | 08.03.2022 | NO | 08.03.2022 | GR | 09.03.2022 | IS | 08.04.2022 | PT | 08.04.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 26.02.2020 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 08.12.2021 | |
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 08.12.2021 | |
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 08.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1299305 (FA. ALFRED SCHMIDT) [AD] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US4013182 (PRATT SAMUEL S, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]CA1153885 (COTE LUCIEN, et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US4744159 (HOULE BERTRAND [CA]) [A] 1-14 * column 6, line 15 - column 7, line 13; figures 9-11 * | by applicant | DE1299305 | US3760883 | DE3911734 |