EP3701947 - IMMUNOMODULATION BY IAP INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For all designated states Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAWEL, Leigh 55 Winter street Arlington, MA Massachusetts 02474 / US | 02 /
DRANOFF, Glenn 28 Outlook Drive Lexingtton, MA Massachusetts 02421 / US | 03 /
DOUGAN, Michael 1788 Beacon Street, Apt. 1A Brookline, MA Massachusetts 02445 / US | 04 /
STRAUB, Christopher, S. 16 Heritage Lane Stow, MA Massachusetts 01775 / US | 05 /
FIRESTONE, Brant, G. Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research Inc. 220 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20159523.8 | 14.05.2009 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | US20085394708P | 16.05.2008 Original published format: US 5394708 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701947 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/437 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/421 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/421, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/427, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2020/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNMODULATION DURCH IAP-HEMMER | [2020/36] | English: | IMMUNOMODULATION BY IAP INHIBITORS | [2020/36] | French: | IMMUNOMODULATION PAR INHIBITEURS IAP | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 17.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09747530.5 / EP2296650 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005077969 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al); | [A]US2005197403 (HARRAN PATRICK G [US], et al); | [A]WO2005094818 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [XD]WO2005097791 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2008014236 (TETRALOGIC PHARMACEUTICALS COR [US], et al); | [XD]WO2008016893 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2008045905 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2008057172 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [XP]WO2008067280 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [XP]WO2008109057 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) |