EP3871805 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRESSURE CASTING METALLIC MATERIAL IN THIXOTROPIC STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bültermann, Bernd Trinklweg 39 8044 Graz-Mariatrost / AT | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Weiser & Voith Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Kopfgasse 7 1130 Wien / AT | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 20159578.2 | 26.02.2020 | [2021/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871805 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22D17/20, B22D17/22 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
B22D17/2272 (EP);
B22D17/007 (EP);
B22D17/2023 (EP);
B22D17/2038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DRUCKGIESSEN VON METALLISCHEM MATERIAL IN THIXOTROPEM ZUSTAND | [2021/35] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRESSURE CASTING METALLIC MATERIAL IN THIXOTROPIC STATE | [2021/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COULÉE SOUS PRESSION D'UN MATÉRIAU MÉTALLIQUE DANS UN ÉTAT THIXOTROPÉMAL | [2021/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0950494 (MOLD MASTERS LTD [CA]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0012]; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 2-18; | [XI]US2004151799 (GELLERT JOBST U [CA], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0032] , [0037] , [0039] , [0048] , [0073] , [0093]; figure 1; claims 1,27 * [I] 2-18; | [I]US2004137107 (BABIN DENIS [CA], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033]; figures 1,2,4,5; claim 1 * |