EP3872165 - METHOD FOR CULTIVATING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ibidi GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 11 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states ibidi GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 11 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zantl, Roman c/o ibidi GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 11 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | 02 /
von Guttenberg, Zeno c/o ibidi GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 11 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | 03 /
Baumann, Nina c/o ibidi GmbH Lochhamer Schlag 11 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | 04 /
Walter, Moriz Gehrenbergweg 6 88239 Wangen im Allgäu / DE | 05 /
Traube, Andrea Florianstraße 1 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 20160085.5 | 28.02.2020 | [2021/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3872165 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/06, C12M1/00, C12M1/34, C12M1/36 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
C12M23/16 (EP);
C12M41/48 (EP,US);
C12M23/20 (EP);
C12M23/22 (EP);
C12M23/34 (EP);
C12M23/40 (EP);
C12M29/00 (EP,US);
C12M29/18 (EP);
C12M29/20 (US);
C12M33/00 (US);
C12M41/00 (EP);
C12M41/36 (US);
C12M47/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2021/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KULTIVIEREN VON ZELLEN | [2021/35] | English: | METHOD FOR CULTIVATING CELLS | [2021/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE | [2021/35] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 22.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP3581642 (UNIV OSAKA PUBLIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1,4,6,8,13 * paragraphs [0028] , [0032] , [0040] - [0042] - [0049] - [0051] - [0054] * * figures 1,3,9 * [A] 2,3,5,7,9-12,14-19; | [A]US2016326476 (MAISCH JAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056] , [0059]; figures 2b,5a-c *; | [A]WO2020018725 (UNIV EMORY [US]) [A] 1,8,16 * paragraphs [0037] - [0044] - [0046] , [0051] , [0053]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2017067009 (SLOANE BONNIE F [US], et al) [A] 1,8,16 * paragraph [0080]; figures 7,8,15,16 *; | [A]US2014287451 (MCFETRIDGE PETER S [US]) [A] 1,8,16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0009]; figures 1.1,2.1 * |