EP3875509 - FLEXIBLE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Davepon, Björn Patentanwaltskanzlei Davepon Schloss Dyck 41363 Jüchen / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 20160305.7 | 02.03.2020 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875509 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/32, C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C08G18/72, C08G18/75, C08G18/79 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
C08G18/755 (EP);
C08G18/3275 (EP);
C08G18/3281 (EP);
C08G18/4816 (EP);
C08G18/4841 (EP);
C08G18/6688 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER SCHAUMSTOFF | [2021/36] | English: | FLEXIBLE FOAM | [2021/36] | French: | MOUSSE SOUPLE | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 15.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2022/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019352445 (ZHAO DONG BO [CN], et al) [A] 1-25 * table 2 * | by applicant | US5147897 | EP1721720 | CN104761700 | CN102558594 | US2006160977 | JP2006257187 | CN101157747 | JP2003012756 | CN101580575 | JP2001072738 | CN101412798 |