EP3876554 - CHARGING AND DISINFECTING STATION FOR A HEARING DEVICE, AND METHOD OF ITS OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonova AG Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEPENHOFF, Matthias Eichstutz 2 8634 Hombrechtikon / CH | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 20160354.5 | 02.03.2020 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876554 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, A61L2/10 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
H04R25/305 (EP);
A61L2/10 (EP);
A61L2202/122 (EP);
A61L2202/24 (EP);
H04R2225/31 (EP);
H04R2460/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] |
Former [2021/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADE- UND DESINFEKTIONSSTATION FÜR EIN HÖRGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2021/36] | English: | CHARGING AND DISINFECTING STATION FOR A HEARING DEVICE, AND METHOD OF ITS OPERATION | [2021/36] | French: | STATION DE CHARGEMENT ET DE DÉSINFECTION D'UN DISPOSITIF AUDITIF ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 15.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]KR20110071183 (MTEK VISION CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-7,9-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2012216418 (SERMAN MAJA [DE], et al) [A] 3-8,14 * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] - [0 36] - [0043]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2019299260 (SHATALOV MAXIM S [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0 37] - [0041] *; | [YD]WO2019236109 (SERENE GROUP INC [US]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 3] , [0 18] - [0028] - [0 39]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | WO2019236109 |