EP3709683 - TRANSMISSION ADJUSTMENT WITHIN A WIRELESS NETWORK FOR A MOVING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airspan IP Holdco LLC 777 Yamato Road, Suite 310 Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US | [2021/17] |
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states Airspan Networks Inc. 777 Yamoto Road, Suite 310 Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOGOTHETIS, Andrew 63A New Road Penn High Wycombe, Buckinghamshire HP10 8DN / GB | 02 /
PERSAUD, Marlon Peter 26 Woodside Avenue Beaconsfield, Buckinghamshire HP9 1JJ / GB | 03 /
DUDZINSKI, Krzysztof 44 Reddington Drive Langley Slough, Berkshire SL3 7QU / GB | 04 /
KATEPALLI, Venkateswarlu 136 Crossways Windsor Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 2NW / GB | 05 /
GOEL, Ashvtosh 22 Boulters Close Slough, Berkshire SL1 9BQ / GB | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20160484.0 | 02.03.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | GB20190003217 | 11.03.2019 Original published format: GB 201903217 | GB20190005222 | 12.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201905222 | GB20190012797 | 05.09.2019 Original published format: GB 201912797 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709683 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3709683 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/08, H04W36/00, H04B7/185, H04W4/42, H04W4/029, H04W4/40 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04B7/18506 (EP,GB,US);
H04W36/0009 (GB);
H04B7/01 (GB,US);
H04B7/185 (GB);
H04B7/18513 (EP);
H04W36/008355 (EP,GB,US);
H04W36/083 (EP,GB,US);
H04W36/32 (EP,GB,US);
H04W4/02 (GB);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04W4/40 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W56/0035 (EP,GB);
H04W64/003 (EP,US);
H04W64/006 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/38] | H04W4/42, H04W4/021, H04W24/02, H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSANPASSUNG INNERHALB EINES DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKS FÜR EIN SICH BEWEGENDES FAHRZEUG | [2020/38] | English: | TRANSMISSION ADJUSTMENT WITHIN A WIRELESS NETWORK FOR A MOVING VEHICLE | [2020/38] | French: | RÉGLAGE DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL POUR UN VÉHICULE MOBILE | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 10.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | IE | 02.03.2023 | LU | 02.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
IE | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
IE | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
IE | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018084562 (RAMAMURTHI VIJAY KUMAR [US], et al); | [X]WO2018078004 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]US2018206133 (VENKATRAMAN SHANKAR [US], et al); | [X]EP3387861 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [I]US2019028172 (HUDSON PETER NOBLE [GB], et al) |