Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11956684 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2024 | B2 | US2022338081 | 20.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016814563 | 10.03.2020 | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201910318 | 18.07.2019 | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | US202217745818 | 16.05.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11924703 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | B2 | US2020328939 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB202003024 | 03.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11910261 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2024 | B2 | US2021367836 | 25.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117395806 | 06.08.2021 | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | US202016827970 | 24.03.2020 | GB202003168 | 05.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11864211 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2024 | B2 | US2022330226 | 13.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016814553 | 10.03.2020 | US202217750176 | 20.05.2022 | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11722940 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2023 | B2 | US2022353768 | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201912797 | 05.09.2019 | US202217860024 | 07.07.2022 | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | US202016814558 | 10.03.2020 | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11582670 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2023 | B2 | US2020329480 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201915033 | 17.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11343825 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | B2 | US2020296710 | 17.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11337127 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2022 | B2 | US2020296649 | 17.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201910318 | 18.07.2019 | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11258660 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2022 | B2 | US2020328801 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201915024 | 17.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11146448 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2021 | B2 | US2020329380 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB202003168 | 05.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3723398 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2023 | B1 | EP3723398 | 14.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201915033 | 17.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3723397 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB202003168 | 05.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3723396 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2024 | B1 | EP3723396 | 14.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB202003024 | 03.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3723392 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2023 | B1 | EP3723392 | 14.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201915024 | 17.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3709682 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2022 | B1 | EP3709682 | 16.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201910318 | 18.07.2019 | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3709533 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2582284 | 05.04.2023 | B | GB2582284 | 23.09.2020 | A | GB201903217D0 | 24.04.2019 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201905222D0 | 29.05.2019 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2582188 | 06.07.2022 | B | GB2582188 | 16.09.2020 | A | GB201910318D0 | 04.09.2019 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2582394 | 24.08.2022 | B | GB2582394 | 23.09.2020 | A | GB201912797D0 | 23.10.2019 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2583153 | 02.11.2022 | B | GB2583153 | 21.10.2020 | A | GB201915024D0 | 04.12.2019 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2583003 | 05.04.2023 | B | GB2583003 | 14.10.2020 | A | GB201915033D0 | 04.12.2019 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2586675 | 08.02.2023 | B | GB2586675 | 03.03.2021 | A | GB202003024D0 | 15.04.2020 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2583831 | 05.04.2023 | B | GB2583831 | 13.01.2021 | A8 | GB2583831 | 11.11.2020 | A | GB202003168D0 | 22.04.2020 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11395203 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2022 | B2 | US2020296644 | 17.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201912797 | 05.09.2019 | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3709683 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2022 | B1 | EP3709683 | 16.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201912797 | 05.09.2019 | GB201905222 | 12.04.2019 | GB201903217 | 11.03.2019 |