Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010024853 | ![]() | 27.05.2010 | A3 | WO2010024853 | 04.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41725009 | 02.04.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010024851 | ![]() | 10.06.2010 | A3 | WO2010024851 | 04.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39414009 | 27.02.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010024847 | ![]() | 03.06.2010 | A3 | WO2010024847 | 04.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010024846 | ![]() | 06.05.2010 | A3 | WO2010024846 | 04.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010024844 | ![]() | 03.06.2010 | A3 | WO2010024844 | 04.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010024842 | ![]() | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | US48792909 | 19.06.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024369792 | ![]() | 07.11.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US202117391368 | 02.08.2021 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US202318171412 | 20.02.2023 | US202418772618 | 15.07.2024 | US201916719224 | 18.12.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023358985 | ![]() | 09.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US202117499244 | 12.10.2021 | US202016833065 | 27.03.2020 | US202318354840 | 19.07.2023 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201916547660 | 22.08.2019 | US201715413919 | 24.01.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020233171 | ![]() | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US202016833065 | 27.03.2020 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201916547660 | 22.08.2019 | US201715413919 | 24.01.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9910236 | ![]() | 06.03.2018 | B2 | US2015185429 | 02.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013251326 | ![]() | 26.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9020320 | ![]() | 28.04.2015 | B2 | US2013148935 | 13.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8559785 | ![]() | 15.10.2013 | B2 | US2013011105 | 10.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US75183910 | 31.03.2010 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | US48792909 | 19.06.2009 | US201213612026 | 12.09.2012 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010322583 | ![]() | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8290333 | ![]() | 16.10.2012 | B2 | US2010202740 | 12.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US75183910 | 31.03.2010 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | US48792909 | 19.06.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8285104 | ![]() | 09.10.2012 | B2 | US2010183270 | 22.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | US48792909 | 19.06.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8301004 | ![]() | 30.10.2012 | B2 | US2010086267 | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8135257 | ![]() | 13.03.2012 | B2 | US2010054686 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41725009 | 02.04.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7945135 | ![]() | 17.05.2011 | B2 | US2010054685 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41525309 | 31.03.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8326107 | ![]() | 04.12.2012 | B2 | US2010054684 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39448309 | 27.02.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8184938 | ![]() | 22.05.2012 | B2 | US2010054683 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8452148 | ![]() | 28.05.2013 | B2 | US2010054682 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7903925 | ![]() | 08.03.2011 | B2 | US2010054676 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39414009 | 27.02.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8620130 | ![]() | 31.12.2013 | B2 | US2010052346 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32427908 | 26.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US48807809 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8944411 | ![]() | 03.02.2015 | B2 | US2010051886 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32427908 | 26.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12072545 | ![]() | 27.08.2024 | B2 | US2023204890 | 29.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US202117391368 | 02.08.2021 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US202318171412 | 20.02.2023 | US201916719224 | 18.12.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11754796 | ![]() | 12.09.2023 | B2 | US2022026655 | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US202117499244 | 12.10.2021 | US202016833065 | 27.03.2020 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201916547660 | 22.08.2019 | US201715413919 | 24.01.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11609396 | ![]() | 21.03.2023 | B2 | US2021356688 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US202117391368 | 02.08.2021 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201916719224 | 18.12.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11294136 | ![]() | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2022066115 | 03.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US202117391368 | 02.08.2021 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US202117523253 | 10.11.2021 | US201916719224 | 18.12.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11294135 | ![]() | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2022066114 | 03.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US202117523236 | 10.11.2021 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US202117391368 | 02.08.2021 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201916719224 | 18.12.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11092767 | ![]() | 17.08.2021 | B2 | US2020124814 | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201916719211 | 18.12.2019 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11086089 | ![]() | 10.08.2021 | B2 | US2020124815 | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201916719224 | 18.12.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10852499 | ![]() | 01.12.2020 | B2 | US2020003982 | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201916376553 | 05.04.2019 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10606014 | ![]() | 31.03.2020 | B2 | US2019377145 | 12.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201916547660 | 22.08.2019 | US201715413919 | 24.01.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10564378 | ![]() | 18.02.2020 | B2 | US2018156998 | 07.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10459184 | ![]() | 29.10.2019 | B2 | US2019243082 | 08.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US201916376529 | 05.04.2019 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10444456 | ![]() | 15.10.2019 | B2 | US2019235190 | 01.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201916376514 | 05.04.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10422971 | ![]() | 24.09.2019 | B2 | US2019235191 | 01.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201916376542 | 05.04.2019 | US81908110 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | US201313746938 | 22.01.2013 | US201815886342 | 01.02.2018 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US201514660074 | 17.03.2015 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10416405 | ![]() | 17.09.2019 | B2 | US2018113264 | 26.04.2018 | A2 | US2017131505 | 11.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201715413919 | 24.01.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10222570 | ![]() | 05.03.2019 | B2 | US2018113265 | 26.04.2018 | A2 | US2017131506 | 11.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US201715413962 | 24.01.2017 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10126514 | ![]() | 13.11.2018 | B2 | US2018113263 | 26.04.2018 | A2 | US2017131504 | 11.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US201715413883 | 24.01.2017 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10120153 | ![]() | 06.11.2018 | B2 | US2018113267 | 26.04.2018 | A2 | US2017160505 | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US201715412900 | 23.01.2017 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10094996 | ![]() | 09.10.2018 | B2 | US2018113266 | 26.04.2018 | A2 | US2017131508 | 11.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US201313901074 | 23.05.2013 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | US201715412839 | 23.01.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5967671B | ![]() | 10.08.2016 | B2 | JP2015057661 | 26.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012530944 | ![]() | 06.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US39225 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012501469 | ![]() | 19.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39414009 | 27.02.2009 | WO2009US04577 | 11.08.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012501467 | ![]() | 19.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | WO2009US04549 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5722776B | ![]() | 27.05.2015 | B2 | JP2012501466 | 19.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | WO2009US04548 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4296741 | ![]() | 20.03.2024 | A3 | EP4296741 | 27.12.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | EP09789090 | 07.08.2009 | EP15184772 | 07.08.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | EP21178012 | 07.08.2009 | WO2009US04548 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3951463 | ![]() | 18.09.2024 | B1 | EP3951463 | 09.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | EP09789090 | 07.08.2009 | EP15184772 | 07.08.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | WO2009US04548 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3104205 | ![]() | 11.12.2024 | B1 | EP3104205 | 22.03.2017 | A3 | EP3104205 | 14.12.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | EP09789091 | 07.08.2009 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | WO2009US04549 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2995981 | ![]() | 09.06.2021 | B1 | EP2995981 | 13.07.2016 | A3 | EP2995981 | 16.03.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | EP09789090 | 07.08.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | WO2009US04548 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2443497 | ![]() | 04.03.2020 | B1 | EP2443497 | 25.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US39225 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2375271 | ![]() | 23.07.2014 | A3 | EP2375271 | 12.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75183910 | 31.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2335108 | ![]() | 16.11.2016 | B1 | EP2335108 | 22.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | WO2009US04549 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2324384 | ![]() | 05.03.2014 | B1 | EP2324384 | 25.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | WO2009US04497 | 06.08.2009 | US48792909 | 19.06.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2321687 | ![]() | 18.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | WO2009US04521 | 06.08.2009 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2321686 | ![]() | 03.10.2012 | B1 | EP2321686 | 18.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39414009 | 27.02.2009 | WO2009US04577 | 11.08.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2318871 | ![]() | 11.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | WO2009US04548 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2159616 | ![]() | 05.06.2013 | B1 | EP2159616 | 03.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32427908 | 26.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US48807809 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2159615 | ![]() | 09.10.2013 | B1 | EP2159615 | 19.05.2010 | A3 | EP2159615 | 03.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41525309 | 31.03.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2159613 | ![]() | 03.10.2012 | B1 | EP2159613 | 26.05.2010 | A3 | EP2159613 | 03.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39448309 | 27.02.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106918885B | ![]() | 21.09.2021 | B | CN106918885 | 04.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201080031413 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102460260 | ![]() | 16.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US39225 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102207596 | ![]() | 05.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US75183910 | 31.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2765837 | ![]() | 09.10.2018 | C | CA2765837 | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US39225 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2735500 | ![]() | 11.10.2016 | C | CA2735500 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39414009 | 27.02.2009 | WO2009US04577 | 11.08.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2734765 | ![]() | 04.04.2017 | C | CA2734765 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | WO2009US04548 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2734718 | ![]() | 25.04.2017 | C | CA2734718 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | WO2009US04549 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019201802B | ![]() | 24.12.2020 | B2 | AU2019201802 | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | AU2015210380 | 05.08.2015 | AU2017221853 | 01.09.2017 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | AU2019201802 | 15.03.2019 | AU2015242945 | 12.10.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017221853 | ![]() | 21.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | AU2015210380 | 05.08.2015 | AU2017221853 | 01.09.2017 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | AU2015242945 | 12.10.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015242945 | ![]() | 29.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | AU2015210380 | 05.08.2015 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | AU2015242945 | 12.10.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015210380B | ![]() | 25.05.2017 | B2 | AU2015210380 | 03.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | AU2009286117 | 07.08.2009 | AU2015210380 | 05.08.2015 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | WO2009US04548 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010263057 | ![]() | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US39225 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009286122B | ![]() | 02.07.2015 | B2 | AU2009286122 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39414009 | 27.02.2009 | WO2009US04577 | 11.08.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009286118 | ![]() | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | WO2009US04549 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009286117 | ![]() | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | WO2009US04548 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009286115 | ![]() | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | WO2009US04521 | 06.08.2009 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009286113C | ![]() | 15.10.2015 | C1 | AU2009286113B | 02.07.2015 | B2 | AU2009286113 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | WO2009US04497 | 06.08.2009 | US48792909 | 19.06.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009208086B | ![]() | 07.05.2015 | B2 | AU2009208086 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39448309 | 27.02.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009208079 | ![]() | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32427908 | 26.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US48807809 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3693778 | ![]() | 12.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10725592 | 18.06.2010 | WO2010US39225 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101793999B | 12.03.2014 | B | CN101793999 | 04.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41525309 | 31.03.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101995626B | 20.03.2013 | B | CN101995626 | 30.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39448309 | 27.02.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102138092B | 26.04.2017 | B | CN102138092 | 27.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | WO2009US04549 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102138093 | 27.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | WO2009US04548 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102165353B | 25.02.2015 | B | CN102165353 | 24.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | WO2009US04521 | 06.08.2009 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102165354B | 07.08.2013 | B | CN102165354 | 24.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US41732509 | 02.04.2009 | WO2009US04497 | 06.08.2009 | US48792909 | 19.06.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102165355B | 15.01.2014 | B | CN102165355 | 24.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39414009 | 27.02.2009 | WO2009US04577 | 11.08.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106873103B | 07.08.2020 | B | CN106873103 | 20.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | CN200980134014 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106873104 | 20.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | US32341508 | 25.11.2008 | CN200980134014 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107367805B | 10.03.2020 | B | CN107367805 | 21.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | CN200980134013 | 07.08.2009 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE20160489T | 20.06.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP20160489 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2443497T | 02.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US39225 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2395361T | 12.02.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39414009 | 27.02.2009 | WO2009US04577 | 11.08.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2613879T | 26.05.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US32342308 | 25.11.2008 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | WO2009US04549 | 07.08.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2793952T | 17.11.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US39225 | 18.06.2010 | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2321686E | 20.12.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | US19706808 | 23.10.2008 | US39414009 | 27.02.2009 | US19053808 | 29.08.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010148336 | ![]() | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21888009 | 19.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | EP2443497 |