Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.11.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
24.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.03.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
11.03.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] |
11.03.2022 | Change - designated states | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] |
08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.12.2021 | Change - applicant | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
06.08.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
17.06.2020 | Change - representative | |
03.03.2020 | Change - representative |