Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12021375 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2024 | B2 | US2023089717 | 23.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20160556 | 03.03.2020 | WO2021EP54756 | 25.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220134636 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20160556 | 03.03.2020 | WO2021EP54756 | 25.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7361939B | Global Dossier | 16.10.2023 | B2 | JP2023516414 | 19.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20160556 | 03.03.2020 | WO2021EP54756 | 25.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115191067 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20160556 | 03.03.2020 | WO2021EP54756 | 25.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3170034 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20160556 | 03.03.2020 | WO2021EP54756 | 25.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021175705 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20160556 | 03.03.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3876374 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20160556 | 03.03.2020 |