EP3876407 - METHOD FOR DETECTING ELECTRIC ARC, AND INVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARICI Holdings The Netherlands B.V. George Hintzenweg 81 3068AX Rotterdam / NL | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Juvonen, Linda ABB Oy Hiomotie 13 00380 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Beck, Christoffer ABB Oy Hiomotie 13 00380 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Koivula, Ville ABB Oy Hiomotie 13 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 20160581.3 | 03.03.2020 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876407 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/32, H02M7/5387, H02H1/00, H02S50/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
H02M7/53875 (EP);
H02H1/0015 (EP);
H02H7/122 (EP);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02S50/00 (EP);
H02S50/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES LICHTBOGENS UND WECHSELRICHTER | [2021/36] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING ELECTRIC ARC, AND INVERTER | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'ARC ÉLECTRIQUE ET ONDULEUR | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 20.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 07.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2012174961 (LARSON BRETT E [US], et al) [I] 1,7 * figure 1 * * figure 6 * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * [Y] 2-6,8-15; | [Y]US2018097354 (YOSCOVICH ILAN [IL], et al) [Y] 2-6,8-15 * figures 7a, 7b * * figure 8b * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0152] *; | [Y]EP2916455 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 2-6,8-15 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] *; | [A]US2016282398 (ZHU XUANCAI [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0043] *; | [A]US9995796 (JOHNSON JAY [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-3 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 53 * |