EP3705726 - APPLICATION OF MACHINE LEARNING TO PROCESS HIGH-FREQUENCY SENSOR SIGNALS OF A TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REEPMEYER, James Ryan General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 02 /
REIMANN, Johan Michael General Electric Company 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 03 /
ADIBHATLA, Gagan General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 04 /
BARBER, Evin Nathaniel General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 05 /
CAFARO, Stefan Joseph General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 06 /
PANJWANI, Rahim General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 07 /
MENDITTO, III, Frederick John General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 08 /
SCHMITZ, Aaron James General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 09 /
KONGSOMBOONVECH, Suchot General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 10 /
ZELINSKI, Richard Anthony General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 20160732.2 | 03.03.2020 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | US201916294358 | 06.03.2019 Original published format: US201916294358 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705726 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3705726 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04D27/02, F04D27/00, G05B13/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
F04D27/001 (EP,US);
F02C9/00 (CN);
F04D27/00 (CN);
F04D27/02 (EP,US);
F04D27/0207 (US);
F04D27/0246 (US);
F04D27/0253 (US);
G01M15/14 (US);
G05B13/027 (US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/044 (US);
G06N3/045 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/37] | F04D27/02, G05B13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2020/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANWENDUNG VON MASCHINENLERNEN ZUM VERARBEITEN HOCHFREQUENTER SENSORSIGNALE EINES TURBINENMOTORS | [2020/37] | English: | APPLICATION OF MACHINE LEARNING TO PROCESS HIGH-FREQUENCY SENSOR SIGNALS OF A TURBINE ENGINE | [2020/37] | French: | APPLICATION D'APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE POUR TRAITER DES SIGNAUX DE CAPTEUR HAUTE FRÉQUENCE D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 01.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010269481 (SNIDER DAVID AUGUST [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,13-15 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * [I] 11,12; | [X]US2014093350 (MEISNER RICHARD P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,13-15 * claims 1,7,10 * * paragraph [0025] *; | [XA]US2015096296 (BANKER ADAM NATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,13-15 * figure 5 * * claims 1-3 * * paragraphs [0063] - [0068] * [A] 7-10; | [XI]US2015184549 (PAMUJULA SURESH [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,13-15 * paragraph [0061]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0207] - [0210] * [I] 5; | [A]US2017089258 (RITTER CURTIS P [US], et al) [A] 7-10* paragraphs [0039] - [0040] *; | [A]US2017356346 (JIANG XIAOMO [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * paragraph [0054] * | Examination | US6539783 | US2010296914 | US2017218854 |