EP3705539 - MICA PIGMENT PARTICLES FOR POWDER COATING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Office of General Counsel Intellectual Property Law Department Attn: IP Documentation Center 800 Phillips Road, MS 105-20C Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRUGIA, Valerie 2468 Lyndhurst Drive Oakville, Ontario L6H 7V8 / CA | 02 /
GARDNER, Sandra 356 Kittridge Road Oakville, Ontario L6H 7K7 / CA | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP JWF The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 20160803.1 | 03.03.2020 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | US201916292257 | 04.03.2019 Original published format: US201916292257 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705539 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/10, C09C1/40, B05B5/03, C09D5/03, C09D167/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
C09C3/10 (EP);
C09D5/036 (US);
B05D1/007 (US);
B05D3/007 (US);
C09C1/0081 (EP);
C09C1/405 (EP);
C09D167/00 (EP);
C09D167/02 (US);
C09D5/032 (EP);
C09D5/035 (US);
C09D7/61 (EP);
C09D7/69 (US);
C09D7/70 (US);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/32 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP);
C01P2004/54 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D167/00, C08K3/34, C08L29/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2020/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLIMMERPIGMENTTEILCHEN FÜR PULVERBESCHICHTUNGSANWENDUNGEN | [2020/37] | English: | MICA PIGMENT PARTICLES FOR POWDER COATING APPLICATIONS | [2020/37] | French: | PARTICULES DE PIGMENT DE MICA POUR DES APPLICATIONS DE REVÊTEMENT EN POUDRE | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 09.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006034879 (MIYAZAKI TAKUMI [JP], et al) [X] 12-16 * paragraphs [0013] - [0072] * * examples 1-8, comp.ex.1-8 * [Y] 1-11,13-20; | [Y]US2009111040 (VEREGIN RICHARD P N [CA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0011] - [0084] *; | [Y]US2012015292 (ANDAYA BRIAN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0005] - [0095] *; | [Y]EP3279741 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0009] - [0076] ** examples 1-14 * |