EP3741977 - ENGINE CONTROL DEVICE, ENGINE CONTROL METHOD, AND ENGINE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEMOTO, Kazuhiro c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Michio c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
SUEOKA, Masanari c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
NISHIMURA, Kazuhiro c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 05 /
HADAMA, Kouji c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 06 /
SUMITA, Masataka c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 07 /
NISHIDA, Masami c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 20161091.2 | 05.03.2020 | [2020/48] | Priority number, date | JP20190094274 | 20.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019094274 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3741977 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3741977 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14, F02D41/22, F02D41/30, F02D41/38, F02D41/40, F02M65/00, F02D41/24 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
F02D41/3041 (EP);
F02D41/3836 (EP,US);
F02D41/1475 (EP,US);
F02D41/221 (EP);
F02D41/247 (EP);
F02D41/401 (EP);
F02D2041/224 (EP);
F02D2041/389 (EP);
F02D2200/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] |
Former [2020/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MOTORSTEUERVORRICHTUNG, MOTORSTEUERVERFAHREN UND MOTORSYSTEM | [2020/48] | English: | ENGINE CONTROL DEVICE, ENGINE CONTROL METHOD, AND ENGINE SYSTEM | [2020/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ET SYSTÈME DE MOTEUR | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 06.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.04.2022 | AT | 20.04.2022 | CZ | 20.04.2022 | DK | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | ES | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | IT | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | NL | 20.04.2022 | PL | 20.04.2022 | RO | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SE | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 20.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003227375 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP1344920 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] ** paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]EP2685074 (DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LUX [LU]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]DE102015215361 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A]US2018291829 (HIRANO TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0093] * | by applicant | JP2018062923 | JP2019094274 |