EP3715517 - NON-WOVEN LAMINATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reifenhäuser GmbH & Co. KG Maschinenfabrik Spicher Straße 46-48 53844 Troisdorf / DE | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Tobias Venloer Str. 336 50823 Köln / DE | 02 /
BOHL Patrick Am Limbachsgraben 13 53773 Hennef / DE | 03 /
FREY Detlef Schlehenweg 5 53859 Niederkassel / DE | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 20161281.9 | 05.03.2020 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | DE201910107771 | 26.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019107771 | [2020/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715517 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/007, B32B5/26, D04H3/16, B32B5/02, D01D5/088, D01D5/22, D01D5/30, D04H3/14, D04H3/147 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
D04H3/007 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
D01D5/22 (EP,BR);
D04H13/00 (KR);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B37/0076 (US);
B32B37/06 (US);
B32B37/156 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
D01D5/088 (BR);
D01D5/0985 (EP);
D01D5/34 (CN);
D01F6/06 (US);
D01F6/30 (EP);
D01F8/06 (EP,CN);
D04H3/018 (CN);
D04H3/10 (CN);
D04H3/14 (EP,BR);
D04H3/147 (EP,KR);
D04H3/16 (US);
D06C23/04 (CN);
B32B2038/0028 (US);
B32B2250/03 (US);
B32B2250/20 (US);
B32B2250/242 (US);
B32B2262/0253 (US);
B32B2305/20 (US);
B32B2307/51 (US);
B32B2309/02 (US);
B32B5/02 (BR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] |
Former [2020/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VLIESLAMINATES UND VLIESLAMINAT | [2020/40] | English: | NON-WOVEN LAMINATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2020/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN STRATIFIÉ NON-TISSÉ ET STRATIFIÉ NON-TISSÉ | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 17.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007098768 (CLOSE KENNETH B [US], et al); | [A]EP2022878 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2017198336 (FIBERTEX PERSONAL CARE AS [DK], et al); | [XPA]WO2019203484 (TORAY ADVANCED MAT KOREA INC [KR]) | by applicant | EP2644763 |