Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
14.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.07.2022 | Change - representative | |
29.04.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
18.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.12.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.12.2021 | First examination report | |
05.02.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
05.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.02.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
05.02.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
07.08.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
06.03.2020 | Change - representative |